EP2476043 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING GENERIC SOFTWARE APPLICATIONS BY MEANS OF OCULAR CONTROL AND SUITABLE METHODS OF INTERACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SR Labs S.R.L. Via Cefalonia, 70 25124 Brescia / IT | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INVERNIZZI, Paolo Via Govone 52 I-20155 Milano / IT | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2012/29] | Cinquantini, Bruno, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 10787877.9 | 13.09.2010 | [2017/49] | WO2010IB02271 | Priority number, date | IT2009FI00198 | 11.09.2009 Original published format: IT FI20090198 | [2012/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011030212 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2476043 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2476043 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/0484 | [2017/29] | CPC: |
G06F3/04842 (EP,US);
G06F3/013 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/29] | G06F3/01, G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG GENERISCHER SOFTWARE-ANWENDUNGEN MITTELS AUGENSTEUERUNG UND INTERAKTIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/29] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR USING GENERIC SOFTWARE APPLICATIONS BY MEANS OF OCULAR CONTROL AND SUITABLE METHODS OF INTERACTION | [2012/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UTILISER DES APPLICATIONS LOGICIELLES GÉNÉRIQUES AU MOYEN D'UNE COMMANDE OCULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉS D'INTERACTION ADÉQUATS | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 19.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.2013 | 30.09.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.2015 | 30.09.2015 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   24.03.2016 | 30.09.2016 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.09.2010 | AL | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/32] | HU | 13.09.2010 | |
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IS | 06.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.09.2010 | |
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 13.09.2010 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
LT | 06.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6323884 (BIRD COLIN LEONARD [GB], et al) [A] 3,5 * column 1, line 10 - line 20 * * column 2, line 23 - column 9, line 35 *; | [A]US2005047629 (FARRELL STEPHEN P [US], et al) [A] 3,5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0024] - [0027] ** paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0091]; figures 3A-4B *; | [A]WO2006045843 (SR LABS S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1,3-5,10,11 * page 4, line 1 - page 8, line 21; figures 2-3 *; | [A]WO2007017500 (SR LABS S R L [IT], et al) [A] 2 * page 3, line 6 - page 7, line 3; figures 2-4 *; | [XI] - KIYOHIKO ABE ET AL, "A system for web browsing by eye-gaze input", ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, SCRIPTA TECHNICA. NEW YORK, US LNKD- DOI:10.1002/ECJ.10110, (20080501), vol. 91, no. 5, pages 11 - 18, XP001523149 [X] 6,7 * section 1 - section 4;;; figures 1-9 * [I] 1-5,8-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ecj.10110 | Examination | EP1679577 |