EP2500972 - LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY HAVING MULTI-DIRECTIONAL LEAD-TAB STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. LG Twin Towers 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Bo Hyun 7-504 LG Employee's Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Ji Hyun 114-7 Gyodong Maeul Hyundai Home Town Mabuk-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-562 / KR | [2013/12] |
Former [2012/38] | 01 /
KIM, Bo Hyun 7-504 LG Employee's Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | ||
02 /
KIM, Jim 114-7 Gyodong Maeul Hyundai Home Town Mabuk-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-562 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/30] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66 rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/38] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10788213.6 | 20.12.2010 | [2017/30] | WO2010KR09129 | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012086855 | Date: | 28.06.2012 | Language: | KO | [2012/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2500972 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2500972 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.06.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/052, H01M2/26, H01M2/30, H01M10/04, H01M10/0585 | [2013/47] | CPC: |
H01M10/0585 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/54 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0413 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0436 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M50/533 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/178 (EP,US);
H01M50/55 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | H01M10/0525, H01M2/26, H01M2/30, H01M10/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUMSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT MULTIDIREKTIONALEM ADER-LASCHEN-AUFBAU | [2012/38] | English: | LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY HAVING MULTI-DIRECTIONAL LEAD-TAB STRUCTURE | [2012/38] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM AYANT UNE STRUCTURE À PATTES CONDUCTRICES MULTIDIRECTIONNELLES | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2012 | Translation filed | 21.12.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2010 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 22.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.04.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 18.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2010 | AL | 26.07.2017 | AT | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | ES | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | IT | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MK | 26.07.2017 | NL | 26.07.2017 | PL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | RS | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | SM | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | NO | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | IE | 20.12.2017 | LU | 20.12.2017 | MT | 20.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.12.2010 | |
AT | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
IE | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
LU | 20.12.2017 | ||
MT | 20.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
IT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
ES | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.07.2017 | |
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | |
NO | 26.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004047239 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10,12-14 * paragraphs [0013] - [0016] - [0020] , [0026] , [0029] , [0030] , [0031] , [0033] , [0051]; figures 1-6; table 1 *; | [X]CN200953357Y (CN ELECT SCI & TECH NO 18 INST [CN]) [X] 1-4,8-11 * figures 2,4,6; examples 1-3 *; | [X]EP1998400 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,8,9,14* paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0025] , [0053] - [0078]; figures 6-10 * | International search | [A]JPH0631070U (SHIN-KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY CO., LTD.); | [A]JPH0656963U (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO., LTD.); | [Y]KR20070091877 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [X]KR20080008245 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]JP2010225496 (JM ENERGY CORP) |