EP2510221 - STARTER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALLAS, Patrick Auf Hart 69 71706 Markgroeningen / DE | [2012/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/42] | Application number, filing date | 10788268.0 | 18.11.2010 | WO2010EP67748 | Priority number, date | DE20091054539 | 11.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009054539 | [2012/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011069800 | Date: | 16.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2510221 | Date: | 17.10.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/08, F02N15/06, F02N15/00, H01H51/28, H01H51/06, H01R11/11, H02K5/22 | [2012/42] | CPC: |
F02N11/087 (EP);
F02N15/00 (EP);
F02N15/067 (EP);
H01H50/14 (EP);
H01H51/065 (EP);
F02D2400/21 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/42] | Title | German: | STARTVORRICHTUNG | [2012/42] | English: | STARTER DEVICE | [2012/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉMARRAGE | [2012/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 29.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 26.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2005001867 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1,5 * page 7 - page 8; figure 5a * [I] 2; | [A]DE29801079U (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,5 * figures 2,1 *; | [A]US2001054407 (OOIZUMI TAKEHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * figure - *; | [A]DE102008001521 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,3,5 * paragraph [0009]; figure - *; | [A]DE7405581U (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2008117007 (YONESHIMA HIRONORI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054]; figures 10,12 *; | [A]US2008084129 (UTSUNOMIYA YAMATO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * | by applicant | DE19726726 |