EP2593663 - STARTING DEVICE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 561 82 Huskvarna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 2 56182 Huskvarna / SE | ||
Former [2015/10] | For all designated states Husqvarna AB Drottninggatan 1 56182 Huskvarna / SE | ||
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states Husqvarna Forestry Products N.A. Inc. 3636 New Boston Road Texarkana, TX 75503 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Jonathan 1112 Long Paw LN. Charlotte NC 28214 / US | 02 /
GLORE, Thomas, G. 5909 Forest Bend Lane Texarkana AR 71854 / US | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/28] | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [2013/21] | Schröer, Gernot H. Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10788437.1 | 17.11.2010 | WO2010US56979 | Priority number, date | US20100364371P | 14.07.2010 Original published format: US 364371 P | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012008980 | Date: | 19.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2593663 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2593663 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02N3/02, F02N5/02, // F02D41/08, F02D41/20 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
F02N3/02 (EP,US);
F02N5/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/21] | F02N3/02, F02N5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STARTERVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2013/21] | English: | STARTING DEVICE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2013/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉMARRAGE POUR UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2013/21] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2013 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/21] | 30.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.11.2010 | AL | 08.07.2015 | AT | 08.07.2015 | BE | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | HR | 08.07.2015 | IT | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | LV | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | MK | 08.07.2015 | MT | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | PL | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | RS | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | SM | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | NO | 08.10.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | IE | 17.11.2015 | LU | 17.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 17.11.2010 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
BG | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.11.2015 | ||
LU | 17.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 17.11.2010 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
BG | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.11.2015 | ||
LU | 17.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.11.2015 | ||
LU | 17.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 17.11.2015 | ||
LU | 17.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 17.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 17.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 17.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 08.07.2015 | |
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB905782 (GRIMMINGER & SCHIF G M B H) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure - *; | [A]EP1596060 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0033] * * figure - *; | [A]EP1712779 (ELECTROLUX AB [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2010170465 (EAKINS JR CHARLES ARTHUR [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figures 5,6 * | by applicant | US19710613643 |