EP2443510 - LIQUID CRYSTAL WAVELENGTH SELECTIVE ROUTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oclaro Israel Ltd. P.O. Box 45076 91450 Jerusalem / IL | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COREM, Yossi Hachatzav Street, 2a 99590 Beit Shemesh / IL | 02 /
WEINBERG, Eli Bayit, 129 90909 Neveh Daniel / IL | 03 /
EITAN, Amos Netzach Yerushalayim Street, 18 90435 Efrat / IL | 04 /
FRENKEL, Boris Nof Harim Street, 09 96190 Jerusalem / IL | 05 /
SUH, Seong Woo 14 Crestwood Circle Mount Olive New Jersey 07828 / US | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 10789108.7 | 17.06.2010 | WO2010IL00480 | Priority number, date | US20090213544P | 18.06.2009 Original published format: US 213544 P | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010146590 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2443510 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/31 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
G02F1/31 (EP);
G02B6/272 (EP);
G02B6/29311 (EP);
G02B6/29395 (EP);
G02F1/1326 (EP);
G02F2201/17 (EP);
G02F2203/585 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/17] | G02F1/29 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | SELEKTIVER ROUTER FÜR DIE FLÜSSIGKRISTALL-WELLENLÄNGE | [2012/17] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL WAVELENGTH SELECTIVE ROUTER | [2012/17] | French: | ROUTEUR À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES À SÉLECTION DE LONGUEUR D'ONDE | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 10.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005041423 (STOCKERYALE INC [US], et al) [A] 11-13 * figure 5 * | International search | [X]US2008316585 (COHEN GIL [US], et al); | [Y]US2008226216 (COREM YOSSI [IL], et al); | [A]US7492986 (KELLY JACK R [US]); | [AP]US2010183310 (SUZUKI KENYA [JP], et al) | by applicant | US2008316585 | WO2005041423 |