EP2445229 - HEARING AID SUITABILITY DETERMINATION DEVICE, HEARING AID PROCESSING REGULATION SYSTEM AND HEARING AID SUITABILITY DETERMINATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAGI, Yoshiaki c/o Panasonic Corp., IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Gempo c/o Panasonic Corp., IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
NOGUCHI, Eiji c/o Panasonic Corp., IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
KATAYAMA, Takashi c/o Panasonic Corp., IPROC IP Development Center 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
TAKATO, Hikaru c/o Tohoku Bunka Gakuen University 6-45-1, Kunimi, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi 981-8551 / JP | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Kügele, Bernhard Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | ||
Former [N/P] | Kügele, Bernhard Novagraaf International SA Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 10789207.7 | 15.06.2010 | WO2010JP03947 | Priority number, date | JP20090143735 | 16.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009143735 | JP20100094485 | 15.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010094485 | [2012/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010146825 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2445229 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, A61B5/12 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/121 (EP,US);
H04R25/70 (EP,US);
H04R2225/43 (EP,US);
H04R25/552 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER EIGNUNG EINES HÖRGERÄTS, PROZESSREGULIERUNGSSYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER EIGNUNG EINES HÖRGERÄTS | [2012/17] | English: | HEARING AID SUITABILITY DETERMINATION DEVICE, HEARING AID PROCESSING REGULATION SYSTEM AND HEARING AID SUITABILITY DETERMINATION METHOD | [2012/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION D'ADÉQUATION D'AIDE AUDITIVE, SYSTÈME DE RÉGULATION DE TRAITEMENT D'AIDE AUDITIVE ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'ADÉQUATION D'AIDE AUDITIVE | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2011 | Translation filed | 16.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 18.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA] - CHEERAN A N ET AL, "Speech processing for hearing aids for moderate bilateral sensorineural hearing loss", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2004. PROCEEDINGS. (ICASSP ' 04). IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MONTREAL, QUEBEC, CANADA 17-21 MAY 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040517), vol. 4, doi:10.1109/ICASSP.2004.1326752, ISBN 978-0-7803-8484-2, pages 17 - 20, XP010718394 [I] 1-4,11-13 * the whole document * [A] 5-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.2004.1326752 | International search | [A]JP2006087018 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al) | [X] - EMI TAKAHASHI ET AL., "Ryoji Bunri Hocho Koka ni Eikyo suru Nanchosha no Choryoku Tokusei ni Kansuru Ichi Kento", THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN (ASJ) CHOKAKU KENKYUKAI SHIRYO, (20050422), vol. 35, no. 3, XP008142751 | by applicant | JP2003501986 | JP2004121338 |