EP2443499 - SPLICING AND TERMINATION MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SJÖDIN, Sofie Maskinistgatan 9 2tr S-117 66 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
RADOJEVIC, Gojko sögatan 120 S-116 24 Stockholm / SE | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Jacobsson, Peter Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Jacobsson, Peter Bergenstråhle & Lindwall AB P.O. Box 17704 SE-118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10789818.1 | 10.06.2010 | WO2010SE50648 | Priority number, date | US20090187408P | 16.06.2009 Original published format: US 187408 P | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010147540 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2443499 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
G02B6/4454 (EP,US);
G02B6/4455 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | SPLICING- UND ANSCHLUSSMODUL | [2012/17] | English: | SPLICING AND TERMINATION MODULE | [2012/17] | French: | MODULE DE RACCORDEMENT ET DE TERMINAISON | [2012/17] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 03.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 09.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9322695 (EDERA EGISTO [IT]); | [X]US2006193586 (HOEHNE ELKE [DE], et al); | [X]US2006275008 (XIN XIN [US]); | [X]US2009148117 (LAURISCH STEFFEN [DE]) | International search | [X]US7460758 (XIN XIN [US]) |