EP2443658 - METHODS OF MAKING VERTICAL JUNCTION FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTORS WITHOUT ION IMPLANTATION AND DEVICES MADE THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/17] | METHODS OF MAKING VERTICAL JUNCTION FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTORS AND BIPOLAR JUNCTION TRANSISTORS WITHOUT ION IMPLANTATION AND DEVICES MADE THEREWITH | ||
[2015/22] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Power Integrations, Inc. 5245 Hellyer Avenue San Jose, CA 95138 / US | [2013/44] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states SS SC IP, LLC 1401 Livingston Lane Jackson, MS 39213 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Lin c/o SemiSouth Laboratories Inc. 201 Research Blvd. Starkville, Mississippi 39759 / US | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10790237.1 | 18.06.2010 | WO2010US39114 | Priority number, date | US20090218751P | 19.06.2009 Original published format: US 218751 P | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010148271 | Date: | 23.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2443658 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/337, H01L29/808, H01L29/10, // H01L29/732, H01L29/24, H01L29/20 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
H01L29/8083 (EP,US);
H01L21/18 (KR);
H01L29/1004 (EP,US);
H01L29/1066 (EP,US);
H01L29/66068 (EP,US);
H01L29/6631 (EP,US);
H01L29/66924 (EP,US);
H01L29/73 (KR);
H01L29/732 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | H01L21/337, H01L29/808, H01L29/10, // H01L29/732 | ||
Former IPC [2012/17] | H01L29/73, H01L21/311, H01L29/732 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HESTELLUNG VON SPERRSCHICHT-FELDEFFEKTTRANSISTOREN OHNE IONENIMPLANTATION UND VORRICHTUNGEN DARAUS | [2015/22] | English: | METHODS OF MAKING VERTICAL JUNCTION FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTORS WITHOUT ION IMPLANTATION AND DEVICES MADE THEREWITH | [2015/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE TRANSISTORS VERTICALS À EFFET DE CHAMP À JONCTION SANS IMPLANTATION D'IONS ET DISPOSITIFS FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CEUX-CI | [2015/22] |
Former [2012/17] | VERFAHREN ZUR HESTELLUNG VON FELDEFFEKTTRANSISTOREN MIT VERTIKALEM ANSCHLUSS UND BIPOLARE ANSCHLUSSTRANSISTOREN OHNE IONENIMPLANTATION UND VORRICHTUNGEN DARAUS | ||
Former [2012/17] | METHODS OF MAKING VERTICAL JUNCTION FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTORS AND BIPOLAR JUNCTION TRANSISTORS WITHOUT ION IMPLANTATION AND DEVICES MADE THEREWITH | ||
Former [2012/17] | PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE TRANSISTORS À EFFET DE CHAMP À JONCTION VERTICALE ET DE TRANSISTORS À JONCTION BIPOLAIRES SANS IMPLANTATION D'IONS ET DISPOSITIFS FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CEUX-CI | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 03.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2003069041 (DENSO CORP) [I] 11-15 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2003273358 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2008091934 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]US6278143 (EJIRI HIROKAZU [JP]); | [A]WO2007018578 (SEMISOUTH LAB INC [US], et al); | [A]KR20070062969 (SEMISOUTH LAB INC [US], et al) | by applicant | JP2003069041 | JP2003273358 |