EP2446060 - DNA-BASED METHODS FOR CLONE-SPECIFIC IDENTIFICATION OF STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Statens Serum Institut Orestads Boulevard 5 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | For all designated states University of Copenhagen Norregade 10 1017 Copenhagen K / DK | For all designated states St. George's University Of London Cranmer Terrace London SW17 0RE / GB | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEGGER, Marc Degnemose AIIé 64 DK-2700 Brønshøj / DK | 02 /
GUARDABASSI, Luca Ernie Wilkins Vej 5, st.tv. DK-2450 Copenhagen SV / DK | 03 /
LINDSAY, Jodi 1C Gleneagle Road London SW16 6AX / GB | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2012/18] | Williams, Aylsa D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10791626.4 | 17.06.2010 | [2017/19] | WO2010DK00093 | Priority number, date | DK20090000767 | 22.06.2009 Original published format: DK 200900767 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010149159 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2446060 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2446060 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 29.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C12Q1/686 (EP,US);
C12Q2561/113 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DNA-BASIERTE VERFAHREN ZUR KLONSPEZIFISCHEN IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2012/18] | English: | DNA-BASED METHODS FOR CLONE-SPECIFIC IDENTIFICATION OF STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2012/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉS BASÉS SUR L'ADN POUR L'IDENTIFICATION SPÉCIFIQUE DE CLONE DE STAPHYLOCOCCUS AUREUS | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 27.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.06.2010 | AL | 10.05.2017 | AT | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | NL | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | IE | 17.06.2017 | LU | 17.06.2017 | MT | 17.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | FR | 10.07.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | GB | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | DE | 03.01.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.06.2010 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 17.06.2017 | ||
LU | 17.06.2017 | ||
MT | 17.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 10.07.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.06.2010 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 17.06.2017 | ||
LU | 17.06.2017 | ||
MT | 17.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 10.07.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 17.06.2010 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 17.06.2017 | ||
LU | 17.06.2017 | ||
MT | 17.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 10.07.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 17.06.2010 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 17.06.2017 | ||
LU | 17.06.2017 | ||
MT | 17.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 10.07.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.06.2010 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 17.06.2017 | ||
LU | 17.06.2017 | ||
MT | 17.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 10.07.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 17.06.2017 | ||
LU | 17.06.2017 | ||
MT | 17.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 10.07.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 17.06.2017 | ||
LU | 17.06.2017 | ||
MT | 17.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 10.07.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 17.06.2017 | ||
LU | 17.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 10.07.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
GB | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 17.06.2017 | ||
LU | 17.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
FR | 10.07.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
IE | 17.06.2017 | ||
LU | 17.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
LU | 17.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/20] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
DE | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - JOSHUA D COCKFIELD ET AL, "Rapid determination of hospital-acquired meticillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus lineages", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, HARLOW, GB, (20070501), vol. 56, no. 5, doi:10.1099/JMM.0.47074-0, ISSN 0022-2615, pages 614 - 619, XP008148960 [X] 13,14 * page 56; figure 1; table 2 * * abstract * [Y] 1-5,7-12,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/jmm.0.47074-0 | [Y] - ALEX VAN BELKUM ET AL, "Methicillin-resistant and -susceptible Staphylococcus aureus sequence type 398 in pigs and humans.", EMERGING INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (20080301), vol. 14, no. 3, doi:10.3201/eid1403.070760, ISSN 1080-6040, pages 479 - 483, XP055039000 [Y] 1-5,7-12,15 * abstract * * page 479 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3201/eid1403.070760 | [X] - MONECKE S ET AL, "Molecular epidemiology of Staphylococcus aureus in asymptomatic carriers", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY & INFECTIOUS DISEASES, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20090512), vol. 28, no. 9, doi:10.1007/S10096-009-0752-2, ISSN 1435-4373, pages 1159 - 1165, XP019743511 [X] 9-13,15 * page 1160, column r; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10096-009-0752-2 | [T] - M. STEGGER ET AL, "Rapid PCR Detection of Staphylococcus aureus Clonal Complex 398 by Targeting the Restriction-Modification System Carrying sau1-hsdS1", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (20101201), vol. 49, no. 2, doi:10.1128/JCM.01970-10, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 732 - 734, XP055038988 [T] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.01970-10 | International search | [X]WO2005056832 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al); | [X]EP1770171 (UNIV KOELN [DE]); | [X] - COCKFIELD ET AL., "Rapid determination of hospital-acquired meticillin-resistant Staphylococcus aureus lineages", JOURNAL OF MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2007), vol. 56, pages 614 - 619, XP008148960 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/jmm.0.47074-0 | [X] - MONECKE ET AL., "Assignment of Staphylococcus aureus isolates to clonal complexes based on microarray analysis and pattern recognition", FEMS IMMUNOLOGY AND MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 53, pages 237 - 251, XP008148967 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1574-695X.2008.00426.x | [A] - WALDRON ET AL., "Sau1: a Novel Lineage-Specific Type I Restriction-Modification System That Blocks Horizontal Gene Transfer into Staphylococcus aureus and between S. aureus isolates of Different Lineages", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 188, no. 15, pages 5578 - 5585, XP008148961 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.00418-06 | by applicant | WO2005056832 |