EP2627795 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CARBURIZING AND CARBONITRIDING METALLIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ipsen International GmbH Flutstrasse 78 47533 Kleve / DE | [2013/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROBLER, Hendrik Weisinger Str. 48 B 89415 Lauingen / DE | 02 /
EDENHOFER, Bernd Hölderlinstrasse 29 47533 Kleve / DE | [2013/34] | Application number, filing date | 10793142.0 | 11.10.2010 | WO2010DE01187 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012048669 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2627795 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/02, C23C8/20, C23C8/22, C23C8/30, C23C8/32, C23C8/34, C23C8/80 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
C23C8/02 (EP);
C23C8/20 (EP);
C23C8/22 (EP);
C23C8/30 (EP);
C23C8/32 (EP);
C23C8/34 (EP);
C23C8/80 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM AUFKOHLEN UND CARBONITRIEREN VON METALLISCHEN WERKSTOFFEN | [2013/34] | English: | METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CARBURIZING AND CARBONITRIDING METALLIC MATERIALS | [2013/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CARBURATION ET CARBONITRURATION DE MATÉRIAUX MÉTALLIQUES | [2013/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 09.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 13.05.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2884523 (CONST MECANIQUES SA ET [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 15; claims 1-10 *; | [A]FR2777911 (AUBERT & DUVAL SA [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 6, line 24 - page 7, line 22; claims 1-12 *; | [AD]EP1160349 (IPSEN INT GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * figure 1; claims 1-17 *; | [AD]EP0080124 (LINDE AG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4049472 | EP0049530 | EP0408511 | DE19523956 | EP1160349 | EP0080124 | - W. GöHRING, HEIß IN DEN OFENRAUM EINGEFüHRTE GASGEMISCHE ALS ATMOSPHäRE BEI DER WäRMEBEHANDLUNG VON STAHL, (1975), vol. 30, no. 2, pages 107 - 111 | - J. WüNNING ET AL., "Gesteuerte Aufkohlung in CO-freien Atmosphären", HTM, (1976), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 132 - 137 | - F. NESTOR ET AL., "Carburization of a high manganese, low carbon steel by methane - nitrogen gas mixtures", J. HEAT TREATING, (1979), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 58 - 63 | - "ALNAT-HC", Deutliche Verminderung der Randoxidation bei der Wärmebehandlung, (2010), vol. 7 |