EP2519137 - A DISHWASHER COMPRISING A MICROFILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOKBIYIK, Ismail E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
ATABEY, Orhan E5 Ankara Asfalti Uzeri Tuzla 34950 Istanbul / TR | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/45] | Application number, filing date | 10793240.2 | 16.12.2010 | WO2010EP69883 | Priority number, date | TR20090010093 | 31.12.2009 Original published format: TR 200910093 | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011080090 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2519137 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, A47L15/46 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
A47L15/4206 (EP,US);
A47L15/4208 (EP,US);
A47L2401/09 (EP,US);
A47L2501/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLER MIT EINEM MIKROFILTER | [2012/45] | English: | A DISHWASHER COMPRISING A MICROFILTER | [2012/45] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE COMPORTANT UN MICROFILTRE | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/36] | 08.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5609172 (CHANG JAE W [KR], et al) [A] 1-8* column 5, line 55 - column 7, line 25; figures 3-5 *; | [XI]EP0774230 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,6-8 * column 2, line 36 - column 7, line 34; figures 1-4 * [I] 3; | [A]US5711325 (KLOSS GERD [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0855165 (SMEG SPA [IT]) [X] 1,4,6-8 * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 49; figure 1 *; | [X]DE3745169 (CANDY ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [X] 1,4-8 * column 2, line 28 - column 4, line 25 *; | [X]EP1256308 (ELECTROLUX HOME PROD CORP [BE], et al) [X] 1,3,5-8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0026]; figure 1 * |