EP2449412 - MAGNETIC RESONANCE DEVICE WITH MAGNET ASSEMBLIES INSIDE A CAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/19] | A CAGE IN AN MRD WITH A FASTENING/ATTENUATING SYSTEM | ||
[2018/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aspect Imaging Ltd. 27 Shaked St. Industrial Area Hevel Modi'in Shoham 6085001 / IL | [2019/02] |
Former [2016/24] | For all designated states Aspect Imaging Ltd. Hashaked Street 27 A.T. Modi'in P.O. Box 926 60850 Shoham / IL | ||
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Aspect Magnet Technologies Ltd. 17 Moshav Ben Shemen 73115 Moshav Ben Shemen / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAPOPORT, Uri 17 Moshav Ben Shemen 73115 Moshav Ben Shemen / IL | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Sessford, Russell Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/17] | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP 16 Upper Woburn Place London WC1H 0BS / GB | ||
Former [2012/19] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 10793725.2 | 29.06.2010 | [2019/17] | WO2010IL00519 | Priority number, date | US20090221571P | 30.06.2009 Original published format: US 221571 P | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011001429 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2449412 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2449412 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/3873, G01R33/38, G01R33/383 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
G01R33/3802 (EP,US);
G01R33/383 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49945 (US);
Y10T29/49959 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | G01V3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGNETRESONANZGERÄT MIT MAGNETANORDNUNGEN IN EINEM KÄFIG | [2018/48] | English: | MAGNETIC RESONANCE DEVICE WITH MAGNET ASSEMBLIES INSIDE A CAGE | [2018/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF À RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE AVEC ENSEMBLES D'AIMANTS À L'INTÉRIEUR D'UNE CAGE | [2018/48] |
Former [2012/19] | KÄFIG IN EINEM MRD MIT BEFESTIGUNGS- BZW. ABDÄMPFUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2012/19] | A CAGE IN AN MRD WITH A FASTENING/ATTENUATING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2012/19] | CAGE DANS DISPOSITIF À RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUES AVEC SYSTÈME DE FIXATION/ATTÉNUATION | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 13.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 06.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12151115.8 / EP2453250 | EP19179551.7 / EP3605131 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2010 | AL | 24.04.2019 | AT | 24.04.2019 | CY | 24.04.2019 | CZ | 24.04.2019 | DK | 24.04.2019 | EE | 24.04.2019 | ES | 24.04.2019 | FI | 24.04.2019 | HR | 24.04.2019 | IT | 24.04.2019 | LT | 24.04.2019 | LV | 24.04.2019 | MC | 24.04.2019 | MK | 24.04.2019 | MT | 24.04.2019 | PL | 24.04.2019 | RO | 24.04.2019 | SE | 24.04.2019 | SI | 24.04.2019 | SK | 24.04.2019 | SM | 24.04.2019 | TR | 24.04.2019 | IE | 29.06.2019 | LU | 29.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | BG | 24.07.2019 | NO | 24.07.2019 | GR | 25.07.2019 | IS | 24.08.2019 | PT | 24.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.06.2010 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
MT | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 29.06.2019 | ||
LU | 29.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.06.2010 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 29.06.2019 | ||
LU | 29.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 29.06.2019 | ||
LU | 29.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 29.06.2019 | ||
LU | 29.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IE | 29.06.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
IT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
ES | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB863272 (FAIREY CO LTD); | [A]US6147578 (PANFIL SHIMON [IL], et al); | [A]US2007273378 (TREQUATTRINI ALESSANDRO [IT], et al) | International search | [Y]US2007068862 (SISEMORE STANLEY L [US]); | [A]US2007096737 (RAPOPORT URI [IL]); | [Y]US2008246476 (RAPOPORT URI [IL]) | by applicant | US5959454 | US6191584 | US6946939 |