EP2450466 - TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1-1 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8321 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUBARA, Masahito 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | 02 /
OHYAMA, Masashi 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-shi Chiba 299-0293 / JP | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstraße 20 DE-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 10793805.2 | 23.06.2010 | WO2010JP04174 | Priority number, date | JP20090155471 | 30.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009155471 | [2012/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011001631 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2450466 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/08, H01B5/14 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
C23C14/086 (EP,US);
C23C14/35 (KR);
C23C14/08 (KR);
C23C14/3414 (EP,US);
H01B5/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTER LEITFÄHIGER FILM | [2012/19] | English: | TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE FILM | [2012/19] | French: | PELLICULE CONDUCTRICE TRANSPARENTE | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2011 | Translation filed | 13.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 17.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JP2000067657 (IBM); | [A]JP2004076094 (OKURA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2001155549 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]WO2007058066 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) |