EP2450881 - APPARATUS FOR ENCODING AND DECODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL USING A WEIGHTED LINEAR PREDICTIVE TRANSFORM, AND METHOD FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNG, Ho Sang c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 02 /
OH, Eun Mi c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Jung-Hoe c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Mi Young c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology Mt. 14-1 Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Brandon, Paul Laurence Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10794320.1 | 28.06.2010 | WO2010KR04169 | Priority number, date | KR20090058530 | 29.06.2009 Original published format: KR 20090058530 | [2012/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011002185 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2450881 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/00, G11B20/10, H04N7/24, G10L19/24 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
G10L19/04 (EP,US);
G10L19/002 (EP,US);
G10L19/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | G10L19/00, G11B20/10, H04N7/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM CODIEREN UND DECODIEREN EINES AUDIOSIGNALS UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER GEWICHTETEN LINEAREN PROGNOSE-TRANSFORM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/19] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ENCODING AND DECODING AN AUDIO SIGNAL USING A WEIGHTED LINEAR PREDICTIVE TRANSFORM, AND METHOD FOR SAME | [2012/19] | French: | APPAREIL DE CODAGE ET DÉCODAGE D'UN SIGNAL AUDIO UTILISANT UNE TRANSFORMÉE À PRÉDICTION LINÉAIRE PONDÉRÉE, ET MÉTHODE ASSOCIÉE | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2012 | Translation filed | 18.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 19.12.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007147518 (BESSETTE BRUNO [CA]) [X] 1-4,6,8-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0165] , [0169] , [0173] , [0174] , [0207] , [0350]; figure 5; tables 4,5a,5b,5c * [I] 5,11; | [A] - HOSANG SUNG ET AL, "Progress report on unvoiced speech coding", 87. MPEG MEETING; 2-2-2009 - 6-2-2009; LAUSANNE; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20090129), no. M16177, XP030044774 [A] 2,3 * Executive summary * | [A] - SEAN A RAMPRASHAD, "The Multimode Transform Predictive Coding Paradigm", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20030301), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 1063-6676, XP011079700 [A] 2,3,6,11 * page 121, column left, line 1 - page 121, column left, line 16; figures 1,3 * | International search | [A]US2008221875 (NAJAF-ZADEH HOSSEIN [CA], et al); | [A]US2008249784 (STACHURSKI JACEK P [US]); | [A]US2009063139 (TAMMI MIKKO [FI], et al); | [A]US2009083046 (MEHROTRA SANJEEV [US], et al) |