EP2448732 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING WOOD FIBRE-PLASTICS COMPOSITE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New Zealand Forest Research Institute Limited Sala Street Rotorua 3010 / NZ | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WARNES, Jeremy Martin c/- Scion Sala Street Rotorua 3010 / NZ | 02 /
FERNYHOUGH, Alan c/- Scion Sala Street Rotorua 3010 / NZ | [2012/21] |
Former [2012/19] | 01 /
WARNES, Jeremy Martin Sala Street Rotorua 3010 / NZ | ||
02 /
FERNYHOUGH, Alan Sala Street Rotorua 3010 / NZ | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/33] |
Former [2012/19] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street GB-London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 10794419.1 | 30.06.2010 | [2018/33] | WO2010NZ00131 | Priority number, date | NZ20090578110 | 30.06.2009 Original published format: NZ 57811009 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011002314 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2448732 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2448732 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B27N1/00, C08J5/04, B27N3/04, C08J5/06, B29B9/04, B29B9/14 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
B27N1/003 (EP,US);
B27N3/04 (EP,US);
B29B7/905 (EP,US);
B29B7/92 (EP,US);
C08J5/045 (EP,US);
B29B7/38 (EP,US);
B29B9/04 (US);
B29B9/06 (EP,US);
B29B9/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | B27N1/00, C08J5/04, B27N3/04, C08J5/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | 20.12.2011 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOLZFASER-KUNSTSTOFF-VERBUNDPRODUKTEN | [2012/19] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING WOOD FIBRE-PLASTICS COMPOSITE PRODUCTS | [2012/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE DES PRODUITS COMPOSITES FIBRE DE BOIS-MATIÈRES PLASTIQUES | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 06.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.12.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 15.12.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.01.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.08.2018 | AT | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | MT | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
AT | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | LT | 15.08.2018 | |
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB999696 (WEYERHAEUSER CO) [X] 1,15-17 * page 1, lines 15-27,48-61 ** example -; claim - *; | [X]US3309444 (EDWARD SCHUELER GEORGE BERTHOL) [X] 1,15-17 * column 1, line 10 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, lines 16-29,45-55 * * column 2, line 69 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, lines 29-63; example -; claim - *; | [X]US3386879 (YAN MAXWELL M, et al) [X] 1,15-17 * column 1, lines 25-40 * * column 2, line 51 - column 3, line 25 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]GB1454118 (DANT RUSSELL INC) [X] 1,16,17 * page 1, lines 13-47 * * page 2, line 75 - page 3, line 8 * * page 4, lines 112-120; example -; claim - * | International search | [A]US4791020 (KOKTA BOHUSLAV V [CA]); | [A]US5480602 (NAGAICH LAXMI [US]); | [A]US5981631 (RONDEN CLIFFORD P [CA], et al); | [A]WO0024800 (ORICA AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [A]US2003046772 (HALAHMI IZHAR [IL], et al); | [A]US2003152793 (WILLEMSE REMCO CORNELIS [NL]); | [X]WO2005021656 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US], et al); | [X]WO2006001717 (NZ FOREST RESEARCH INST LTD [NZ], et al); | [X]WO2007073218 (NZ FOREST RESEARCH INST LTD [NZ], et al) | by applicant | WO2006001717 |