EP2449046 - SURFACE TREATMENT PROCESS AND TREATED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Yu 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 02 /
MOORE, George G. I. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | 03 /
KLUN, Thomas P. 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10794574.3 | 25.06.2010 | WO2010US39900 | Priority number, date | US20090221575P | 30.06.2009 Original published format: US 221575 P | US20090221574P | 30.06.2009 Original published format: US 221574 P | US20100792153 | 02.06.2010 Original published format: US 792153 | US20100792065 | 02.06.2010 Original published format: US 792065 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011002668 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2449046 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 06.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/16, C08L83/16, C08G77/62 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C08G77/62 (EP,US);
C08L83/16 (EP,US);
B05D2202/25 (EP,US);
B05D3/0254 (EP,US);
B05D5/083 (EP,US);
C08G77/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | C09D183/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UND BEHANDELTER ARTIKEL | [2012/19] | English: | SURFACE TREATMENT PROCESS AND TREATED ARTICLE | [2012/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE ET ARTICLE TRAITÉ | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 26.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 17.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2002105728 (YAMAGUCHI KOUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 15 * examples 1-3; claim 1 *[A] 1-14; | [X]US2006246221 (FALK UWE [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0017] - [0019]; claim 1 *; | [XPA]US2010015453 (YAMAGUCHI KOICHI [JP], et al) [XP] 15 * claim 6 * [A] 1-14 | International search | [A]JPH03290437 ; | [A]JPH07196987 ; | [A]WO0244264 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [A]US2002105728 (YAMAGUCHI KOUICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2006246221 (FALK UWE [DE], et al); | [AP]US2010015453 (YAMAGUCHI KOICHI [JP], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP3290437 A 19911220 (SHIN ETSU CHEM CO LTD) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP7196987 A 19950801 (TONEN CORP) |