EP2507933 - SOUNDING REFERENCE SIGNAL ENHANCEMENTS FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUO, Xiliang 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 03 /
GAAL, Peter 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 04 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/30] |
Former [2012/41] | Wegner, Hans, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10795119.6 | 02.12.2010 | [2023/30] | WO2010US58767 | Priority number, date | US20090266456P | 03.12.2009 Original published format: US 266456 P | US20100958214 | 01.12.2010 Original published format: US 958214 | [2012/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011068995 | Date: | 09.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2507933 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2507933 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0035 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
H04L5/0094 (EP,BR,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/0446 (BR,US);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
H04W72/1263 (BR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOUNDING-REFERENZSIGNALVERBESSERUNGEN FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION | [2023/09] | English: | SOUNDING REFERENCE SIGNAL ENHANCEMENTS FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION | [2012/41] | French: | AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES AU TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL DE SONDAGE DE RÉFÉRENCE POUR UNE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2012/41] |
Former [2012/41] | LOTUNGSREFERENZSIGNALVERSTÄRKUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 10.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23180032.7 / EP4236180 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 26.07.2023 | |
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 26.07.2023 | |
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 26.10.2023 | |
GR | 27.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006013338 (GORE DHANANJAY A [US], et al); | Examination | WO2010036053 | by applicant | US19560612664 |