EP2556607 - APPARATUS FOR POWER EQUALISATION AND PHASE CORRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oclaro Technology Limited Caswell Towcester, Northamptonshire NN12 8EQ / GB | [2013/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Wenfei Flat 4 Elmdene Morin Road Paignton Devon TQ3 2PL / GB | 02 /
DRAKE, Jonathan Stuart 12 Grange Heights Paignton Devon TQ4 7J / GB | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 10795261.6 | 02.12.2010 | WO2010EP68754 | Priority number, date | US20100321916P | 08.04.2010 Original published format: US 321916 P | [2013/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011124281 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2556607 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/155, G02F1/01 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
H04B10/5051 (EP,US);
H03H11/16 (US);
H04B10/508 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FPR LEISTUNGSAUSGLEICH UND PHASENKORREKTUR | [2013/07] | English: | APPARATUS FOR POWER EQUALISATION AND PHASE CORRECTION | [2013/07] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UNE ÉGALISATION DE PUISSANCE ET UNE CORRECTION DE PHASE | [2013/07] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/33] | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.11.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6619866 (SUN CHEN-KUO [US], et al) [A] 1-17* abstract *; | [A]US2005046843 (DOERR CHRISTOPHER R [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]US2010008680 (CHEN JYEHONG [TW], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A]US2010054756 (NISHIHARA MASATO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [A] - XIAOXIA WU ET AL, "Synchronization Monitoring of I/Q Data and Pulse Carving Misalignment for a Parallel-Type RZ-DQPSK Transmitter by Measuring RF Clock Tone/Low Frequency Power", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20081215), vol. 18, no. 24, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 2138 - 2140, XP011237396 [A] 1-17 * abstract * |