EP2516474 - MODIFIED POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Styron Europe GmbH Zugerstrasse 231 8810 Horgen / CH | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THIELE, Sven Käuzchenweg 2 06120 Halle / DE | 02 /
RULHOFF, Sascha Rathenauplatz 5 06114 Halle / DE | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10795953.8 | 20.12.2010 | WO2010EP07804 | Priority number, date | US20090288519P | 21.12.2009 Original published format: US 288519 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079922 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2516474 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2516474 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2516474 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08F36/04, C08F236/10, C08L15/00, C08F4/48, C08C19/44 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
C08C19/44 (EP,US);
C08C19/22 (KR);
B60C1/00 (EP,US);
C08C19/25 (KR);
C08C19/26 (KR);
C08F236/10 (EP,US);
C08F36/04 (EP,US);
C08L15/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L9/06 (KR);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K5/548 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/86 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F236/10, C08F4/48 (US,EP);
C08F36/04, C08F4/48 (EP,US);
C08L15/00, C08L2666/08 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | C08C19/22, C08C19/25, C08C19/26, C08C19/44, C08L9/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2012/44] | English: | MODIFIED POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | [2012/44] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYMÈRE MODIFIÉ | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 04.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.11.2013 | AT | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | HR | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MK | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | RS | 06.11.2013 | SE | 06.11.2013 | SI | 06.11.2013 | SM | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | IE | 20.12.2013 | LU | 20.12.2013 | NO | 06.02.2014 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SI | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | |
NO | 06.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5502131 (ANTKOWIAK THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0224764 (FMC CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [A]WO2007047943 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008130782 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009148932 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | US3078254 | US3244664 | US3281383 | US3629213 | US3692874 | US3951936 | US3978103 | US4048206 | US4474908 | DD236321 | DD237513 | US4616069 | DD242232 | US4689368 | US4931376 | US5086136 | US5089574 | US5134199 | US5448002 | US5502131 | US5736617 | US5753579 | US5753761 | US5786441 | US5792820 | US5834573 | US5852189 | US5866650 | US5912343 | EP0924214 | US5916961 | US5959048 | JPH11301794 | EP0964008 | US6018007 | US6025450 | US6046288 | US6080835 | US6103842 | US6184168 | US6229036 | US6310152 | US6489415 | US2003065114 | US6627715 | EP1367069 | US6693160 | US6777569 | US2005124740 | US2005159513 | WO2007047943 | US7342070 | WO2009077837 | WO2009148932 | WO2010056694 | - "Synthesis of end-functionalized polymer by means of living anionic polymerization", JOURNAL OF MACROMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, (1996), vol. 197, pages 3135 - 3148 | - TANAKA ET AL., POLYMER, (1981), vol. 22, pages 1721 - 1723 | - KAUTSCHUK GUMMI KUNSTSTOFFE, vol. 52, pages 799 - 805 | - KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chemical technology, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, (1982), vol. 20, pages 365 - 468 | - VULCANIZING AGENTS AND AUXILIARY MATERIALS, pages 390 - 402 |