EP2648927 - VEHICLE AXLE SUSPENSION, AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH VEHICLE AXLE SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VDL Weweler B.V. 149, Kayersdijk 7332 AP Apeldoorn / NL | [2013/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AALDERINK, Derk Geert 46a, Zutphenseweg NL-7245 NV Laren / NL | [2013/42] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2013/42] | Application number, filing date | 10796185.6 | 09.12.2010 | WO2010NL50835 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012078031 | Date: | 14.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2648927 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2648927 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60G11/113, B60G11/46, B60B35/08, B60G9/00, B60G7/00 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
B60G11/113 (EP,US);
B60G11/465 (EP,US);
B60G7/001 (EP,US);
B60G7/008 (US);
B60G9/003 (EP,US);
B60G2200/31 (EP,US);
B60G2204/148 (EP,US);
B60G2204/42 (EP,US);
B60G2204/4306 (EP,US);
B60G2204/44 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGACHSAUFHÄNGUNG UND FAHRZEUG MIT EINER DERARTIGEN FAHRZEUGACHSAUFHÄNGUNG | [2013/42] | English: | VEHICLE AXLE SUSPENSION, AND VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH VEHICLE AXLE SUSPENSION | [2013/42] | French: | SUSPENSION D'ESSIEU DE VEHICULE, ET VEHICULE COMPRENANT UNE TELLE SUSPENSION D'ESSIEU DE VEHICULE | [2014/18] |
Former [2013/42] | SUSPENSION D'ESSIEU DE VÉHICULE, ET VÉHICULE COMPRENANT UNE TELLE SUSPENSION D'ESSIEU DE VÉHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 23.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2010 | AL | 20.08.2014 | AT | 20.08.2014 | BE | 20.08.2014 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | DK | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | ES | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | HR | 20.08.2014 | IT | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MK | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | NL | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | RS | 20.08.2014 | SE | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | SM | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | NO | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | GB | 09.12.2014 | IE | 09.12.2014 | LU | 09.12.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | FR | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MK | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 09.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 09.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.12.2010 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 09.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 09.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 09.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 09.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 09.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/48] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
GB | 09.12.2014 | ||
IE | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 09.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 09.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IE | 09.12.2014 | ||
LU | 09.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
LU | 09.12.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
RS | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP2130688 (WEWELER NV [NL]) [X] 1-3,14 * paragraph [0019]; figures 1-3; claim - * [Y] 4; | [XAY]EP1334848 (SCHMITZ CARGOBULL AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,11-14 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0025]; figures 3,4; claim - * [A] 3,6,7 [Y] 4; | [YA]EP1508459 (WEWELER NV [NL]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020]; figure 6 * * paragraph [0016] * [A] 1,14; | [X]DE19946802 (SCHMITZ CARGOBULL AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,14 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008046488 (SAF HOLLAND GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,11-14 * figure - *; | [A]DE29615286U (TRENKAMP & GEHLE [DE]) [A] 1,2,14 * figure - *; | [A]EP1580044 (WEWELER NV [NL]) [A] 1,6-9,14 * figure - *; | [AD]WO2009014423 (WEWELER NV [NL], et al) [AD] 1,6,14 * figures 1-3,9a,9b *; | [A]EP1273464 (WEWELER NV [NL]) [A] 1,8,9,14 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE29616351U (SAUER ACHSENFAB [DE]) [A] 1,14 * figures 1b,3 * | by applicant | EP1334848 | WO2009014423 |