EP2453464 - EUV-LITHOGRAPHY REFLECTION-TYPE MASK BLANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHI, Kazuyuki c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
UNO, Toshiyuki c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10797161.6 | 07.07.2010 | WO2010JP61560 | Priority number, date | JP20090161607 | 08.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009161607 | [2012/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011004850 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2453464 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/027, G03F1/16 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
G03F1/24 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/0274 (KR);
B82Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,KR,US);
G03F1/20 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | REFLEXIONSMASKENROHLING FÜR DIE EUV-LITHOGRAPHIE | [2012/20] | English: | EUV-LITHOGRAPHY REFLECTION-TYPE MASK BLANK | [2012/20] | French: | ÉBAUCHE DE MASQUE DE TYPE À RÉFLEXION POUR LITHOGRAPHIE PAR ULTRAVIOLET EXTRÊME | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2011 | Translation filed | 17.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 26.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS5928158 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [A]JPH07114173 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH09281692 (NIKON CORP); | [X]JP2002299227 (NIKON CORP); | [X]JP2003243292 (NIKON CORP); | [X]JP2004006798 (HOYA CORP) | by applicant | JPH0378163B | US5641593 | JP2003501823 | JP2004006798 | JP2006228766 | US7390596 | JP2009161607 |