EP2452506 - METHOD FOR DISPLAYING THREE-DIMENSIONAL USER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Sung Ho Intellectual Property Center LG Electronics Inc. 19-1 Cheongho-ri Jinwi-myeon Pyeongtaek-si Gyeonggi-do 451-731 / KR | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10797238.2 | 31.05.2010 | WO2010KR03451 | Priority number, date | US20090223385P | 07.07.2009 Original published format: US 223385 P | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011004963 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2452506 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N13/00, H04N7/08 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
H04N13/128 (EP,US);
H04N13/00 (KR);
H04N13/111 (EP,US);
H04N13/183 (EP,US);
H04N13/30 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE EINER DREIDIMENSIONALEN BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE | [2012/20] | English: | METHOD FOR DISPLAYING THREE-DIMENSIONAL USER INTERFACE | [2012/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'UNE INTERFACE UTILISATEUR EN TROIS DIMENSIONS | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 10.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/43] | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5880729 (JOHNSTON JR ROBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-15 * col. 5, line 58- col. 6, line 7 * [I] 6,7; | [XI]US6157383 (LOOP CHARLES T [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-15 * col. 7, lines 8-36, Figures 3b, 3c * [I] 6,7; | [XI]WO0131585 (IDO SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-15 * page 3, lines 12-19 * [I] 6,7; | [XI]EP1187495 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,8-15 * Figures 4-6, page 50-54 * [I] 6,7; | [XI] - "3D Active Button Magic", 20020101, (20020101), pages 1 - 12, XP007922454 [X] 1,2,4,5,8-15 * the whole document * [I] 6,7 | International search | [A]US2007300184 (SONG KEUN-MI [KR]); | [A]US7441201 (PRINTEZIS ANTONIOS [US]); | [A]US2009002368 (VITIKAINEN TIMO [FI], et al) | Examination | JP2005065162 |