EP2446023 - ADULT ANIMALS GENERATED FROM INDUCED PLURIPOTENT CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Scripps Research Institute Mail Drop TPC-8 10550 North Torrey Pines Road La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDWIN, Kristin 1457 Torrey Pines Road, Apt. 1 La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Schrell, Andreas, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Schrell, Andreas, et al Gleiss Grosse Schrell & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstrasse 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 10797604.5 | 23.06.2010 | WO2010US39679 | Priority number, date | US20090269412P | 23.06.2009 Original published format: US 269412 P | US20090230062P | 30.07.2009 Original published format: US 230062 P | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011005580 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2446023 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/074, C12N5/10, C12N15/86, C12N15/12 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
C12N5/0696 (EP,US);
A01K67/0271 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
C12N2501/065 (EP,US);
C12N2501/602 (EP,US);
C12N2501/603 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | ERWACHSENE TIERE, DIE AUS INDUZIERTEN PLURIPOTENTEN ZELLEN ERZEUGT WURDEN | [2012/18] | English: | ADULT ANIMALS GENERATED FROM INDUCED PLURIPOTENT CELLS | [2012/18] | French: | ANIMAUX ADULTES GÉNÉRÉS À PARTIR DE CELLULES PLURIPOTENTES INDUITES | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 05.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/25] | 05.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19632532 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [I]GB2450603 (BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG [DE]) [I] 1-7 * example 12 *; | [XDI] - MARIUS WERNIG ET AL, "A drug-inducible transgenic system for direct reprogramming of multiple somatic cell types", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 26, no. 8, doi:10.1038/NBT1483, ISSN 1087-0156, (20080801), pages 916 - 924, (20080701), XP008148061 [XD] 1,2,5-8,11-13 * page 923, column r; figure 3f * [I] 4,9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1483 | [XI] - DIRK HOCKEMEYER ET AL, "A Drug-Inducible System for Direct Reprogramming of Human Somatic Cells to Pluripotency", CELL STEM CELL, CELL PRESS, US, vol. 3, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.STEM.2008.08.014, ISSN 1934-5909, (20080911), pages 346 - 353, (20080910), XP008148052 [X] 8 * the whole document * [I] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2008.08.014 | [XI] - HUANGFU DANWEI ET AL, "Induction of pluripotent stem cells by defined factors is greatly improved by small-molecule compounds", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 26, no. 7, doi:10.1038/NBT1418, ISSN 1087-0156, (20080701), pages 795 - 797, (20080622), XP002502536 [X] 8,11-13 * the whole document * [I] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT1418 | [I] - WILLIAM Y. GO ET AL, "Optimization and direct comparison of the dimerizer and reverse tet transcriptional control systems", THE JOURNAL OF GENE MEDICINE, (20020501), vol. 4, no. 3, doi:10.1002/jgm.271, ISSN 1099-498X, pages 258 - 270, XP055071536 [I] 9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jgm.271 | [A] - YONEKURA ET AL, "Transgenic mice expressing tamoxifen-inducible Cre recombinase in mitral/tufted cells of the olfactory bulb", NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, SHANNON, IR, (20070101), vol. 58, doi:10.1016/J.NEURES.2007.06.1157, ISSN 0168-0102, page S101, XP022175279 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neures.2007.06.1157 | [XPI] - XIAO-YANG ZHAO ET AL, "iPS cells produce viable mice through tetraploid complementation", NATURE, (20090903), vol. 461, no. 7260, doi:10.1038/nature08267, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 86 - 90, XP055053671 [XP] 8,11-14 * the whole document * [I] 1-7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08267 | [XP] - MICHAEL J BOLAND ET AL, "Adult mice generated from induced pluripotent stem cells", NATURE: INTERNATIONAL WEEKLY JOURNAL OF SCIENCE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, UNITED KINGDOM, vol. 461, no. 7260, doi:10.1038/NATURE08310, ISSN 0028-0836, (20090903), pages 91 - 96, (20090802), XP008148059 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08310 | [T] - D. H. BETTS ET AL, "Viable iPSC mice: a step closer to therapeutic applications in humans?", MOLECULAR HUMAN REPRODUCTION, (20100201), vol. 16, no. 2, doi:10.1093/molehr/gap101, ISSN 1360-9947, pages 57 - 62, XP055071304 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/molehr/gap101 | International search | [X] - WERNIG M. ET AL., "A drug-inducible transgenic system for direct reprogramming of multiple somatic cell types.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20080701), vol. 26, no. 8, pages 916 - 924, XP008148061 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1483 | [X] - HOCKEMEYER, D., "A drug-inducible system for direct reprogramming of human somatic cells to pluripotency.", CELL STEM CELL., (20080911), vol. 3, pages 346 - 353, XP008148052 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.stem.2008.08.014 | [X] - SOLDNER, F. ET AL., "Parkinson's disease patient-derived induced pluripotent stem cells free of viral reprogramming factors.'", CELL., (20090306), vol. 136, pages 964 - 977, XP002552497 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2009.02.013 | [Y] - HUANGFU, D. ET AL., "Induction of pluripotent stem cells by defined factors is greatly improved by small-molecule compounds.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20080622), vol. 26, no. 7, pages 795 - 797, XP002502536 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NBT1418 | [XP] - BOLAND, M.J. ET AL., "Adult mice generated from induced pluripotent stem cells.", NATURE., (20090903), vol. 461, no. 3, pages 91 - 96, XP008148059 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08310 |