EP2452516 - LOW DUTY MODE FOR FEMTOCELL BASE STATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Intel Corporation MS: RNB-4-150 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENKATACHALAM, Muthaiah 16620 NW Paddington DR Beaverton Oregon 97006 / US | 02 /
YANG, Xiangying 15864 Nw Ryegrass St Portland Oregon 97229 / US | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | HGF 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Clarke, Jeffrey Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10797654.0 | 01.07.2010 | WO2010US40817 | Priority number, date | US20090223360P | 06.07.2009 Original published format: US 223360 P | US20090646337 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: US 646337 | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011005662 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2452516 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04W8/00, H04W76/04, H04W36/04 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
H04L12/66 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (KR);
H04W36/00837 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/0085 (EP,US);
H04W36/04 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/02 (KR);
H04W52/0206 (EP,US);
H04W52/10 (EP,US);
H04W52/146 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/51] | H04W48/16, H04W8/00, H04W76/04 | ||
Former IPC [2012/20] | H04W16/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | NIEDRIGLEISTUNGSMODUS FÜR FEMTOZELLEN-BASISSTATIONEN | [2012/20] | English: | LOW DUTY MODE FOR FEMTOCELL BASE STATIONS | [2012/20] | French: | MODE À FAIBLE UTILISATION POUR STATIONS DE BASE FEMTOCELLULAIRES | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 08.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/45] | 21.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2012 | 31.07.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007254620 (LINDQVIST THOMAS L E [SE], et al); | [A]US2009046632 (NANDA SANJIV [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2009052395 (BAO DEREK HONGWEI [US], et al); | [A]KR20090045183 (UNIV KYONGGI IND & ACAD COOP [KR]); | [A]KR20090049389 (SK TELECOM CO LTD [KR]) |