EP2507783 - A MULTI-PRIMARY DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TP Vision Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLOMPENHOUWER, Michel, Adriaanszoon c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
LANGENDIJK, Erno, Hermanus, Antonius c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
SEVO, Aleksandar c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/41] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10798391.8 | 25.11.2010 | WO2010IB55407 | Priority number, date | EP20090177608 | 01.12.2009 Original published format: EP 09177608 | [2012/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011067699 | Date: | 09.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2507783 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/20 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
G09G3/2074 (EP,US);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G2300/0452 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Title | German: | MULTIPRIMÄRE KONVERSION | [2012/41] | English: | A MULTI-PRIMARY DISPLAY | [2012/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À MULTIPLES COULEURS PRIMAIRES | [2012/41] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 14.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2009034714 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-8,12,14,15 * figures 3-9,70-71 * [I] 9-11,13; | US2010207969 [ ] (UEKI SHUN [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0001] , [0142] - [0159] ** figures 3-9,70-71 * |