EP2515900 - METHOD OF TREATING ATRIAL FIBRILLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilead Sciences, Inc. 333 Lakeside Drive Foster City, CA 94404 / US | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTZELEVITCH, Charles 101 Sylvan Way New Hartford New York 13413 / US | 02 /
BELARDINELLI, Luiz 205 Manzanita Ave. Palo Alto California 94304 / US | 03 /
BURASHNIKOV, Alexander 59 Imperial Dr. New Hartford New York 13413 / US | 04 /
SHRYOCK, John 2313 Vines Ct. East Palo Alto California 94303 / US | 05 /
ZENG, Dewan 871 Sycamore Dr. Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2014/27] | Wallace, Sheila Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/44] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10798436.1 | 20.12.2010 | WO2010US61257 | Priority number, date | US20090288739P | 21.12.2009 Original published format: US 288739 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011084733 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2515900 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2515900 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/343, A61K31/495, A61P9/06 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/495 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/343 (EP,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/343, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/495, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | 12.07.2012 | ME | 12.07.2012 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON VORHOFFLIMMERN | [2012/44] | English: | METHOD OF TREATING ATRIAL FIBRILLATION | [2012/44] | French: | METHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA FIBRILLATION AURICULAIRE | [2014/43] |
Former [2012/44] | MÉTHODE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA FIBRILLATION ATRIALE | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 04.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14161300.0 / EP2749282 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2017/16] |
Former [2017/13] | IT | 20.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009150535 (SANOFI AVENTIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-47 * page 2, lines 15-17; claim 1 *; | [AD] - FOR THE ERATO STUDY INVESTIGATORS ET AL, "Dronedarone for the control of ventricular rate in permanent atrial fibrillation: The Efficacy and safety of dRonedArone for The cOntrol of ventricular rate during atrial fibrillation (ERATO) study", AMERICAN HEART JOURNAL, MOSBY- YEAR BOOK INC, US, vol. 156, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.AHJ.2008.06.010, ISSN 0002-8703, (20080901), pages 527.E1 - 527.E9, (20080827), XP025470440 [AD] 1-47 * abstract * * page 527.e2, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 527.e7, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 527.e8, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ahj.2008.06.010 | [A] - KUMAR KAPIL ET AL, "New and emerging antiarrhythmic drugs for atrial fibrillation: what may become available to the clinician in the near future.", CURRENT TREATMENT OPTIONS IN CARDIOVASCULAR MEDICINE, (200910), vol. 11, no. 5, ISSN 1534-3189, pages 373 - 380, XP002631255 [A] 1-47 * abstract * * page 374, paragraph 6 - page 375, paragraph 1 * * page 378, paragraphs 2-3 * | [AD] - ANTZELEVITCH C ET AL, "Atrial-selective sodium channel block as a novel strategy for the management of atrial fibrillation", JOURNAL OF ELECTROCARDIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, vol. 42, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.JELECTROCARD.2009.07.007, ISSN 0022-0736, (20091101), pages 543 - 548, (20090820), XP026702881 [AD] 1-47 * abstract * * page 546, column 1, paragraph 6 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 547, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jelectrocard.2009.07.007 | [AD] - SCIRICA BENJAMIN M ET AL, "Effect of ranolazine, an antianginal agent with novel electrophysiological properties, on the incidence of Arrhythmias in patients with Non-ST-Segment-Elevation acute coronary syndrome - Thrombolysis in myocardial infarction 36 (MERLIN-TIMI 36) Randomized controlled trial", CIRCULATION, (200710), vol. 116, no. 15, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 1647 - 1652, XP002631256 [AD] 1-47 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/circulationaha.107.724880 | [A] - GRAMLEY FELIX ET AL, "Recent advances in the pharmacological treatment of cardiac arrythmias.", DRUGS OF TODAY, BARCELONA, SPAIN, (200911), vol. 45, no. 11, ISSN 1699-3993, pages 807 - 824, XP002631257 [A] 1-47 * page 817, column 2, lines 34-35 * | [AD] - BURASHNIKOV ALEXANDER ET AL, "Author Manuscript:Atrial-selective sodium channel block for the treatment of atrial fibrillation.", NIH Public Access, (200906), pages 1 - 25, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC2756337/pdf/nihms125373.pdf, (20110405), XP002631258 [AD] 1-47 * the whole document * * Published in final edited form as: Expert Opin Emerg Drugs. 2009 June, 14(2). 233-249 * | [AD] - SICOURI S ET AL, "Antiarrhythmic effects of ranolazine in canine pulmonary vein sleeve preparations", HEART RHYTHM, ELSEVIER, US, vol. 5, no. 7, doi:10.1016/J.HRTHM.2008.03.018, ISSN 1547-5271, (20080701), pages 1019 - 1026, (20080321), XP022819454 [AD] 1-47 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.hrthm.2008.03.018 | [AD] - HOHNLOSER STEFAN H ET AL, "Effect of dronedarone on cardiovascular events in atrial fibrillation", NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, MASSACHUSETTS MEDICAL SOCIETY, BOSTON, MA, US, (20090212), vol. 360, no. 7, doi:10.1056/NEJMOA0803778, ISSN 1533-4406, pages 668 - 678, XP002604030 [AD] 1-47 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa0803778 | by applicant | US3845770 | US4326525 | US4567264 | US4902514 | US5223510 | US5472707 | US5506229 | US5616345 | US6503911 | US6852724 | US6939865 | US7022343 | US2006177502 | US7323493 | - FUSTER ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2006), vol. 114, no. 7, pages E257 - 354 | - ROY ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2008), vol. 358, no. 25, pages 2667 - 2677 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, (1985), page 1418 | - BURASHNIKOV ET AL., BURASHNIKOV, (2007), vol. 116, pages 1449 - 1457 | - SONG ET AL., AM JPHYSIOL, (2008), vol. 294, pages H2031 - 2039 | - SICOURI ET AL., HEART RHYTHM, (2008), vol. 5, pages 1019 - 1026 | - BURASHNIKOV ET AL., VENTRICULAR MYOCARDIUM, (2007), vol. 116, pages 1449 - 1457 | - ANTZCLCVITCH ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 110, pages 904 - 910 | - BURASHNIKOV ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2007), vol. 116, pages 1449 - 1457 | - ANTZELEVITCH ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 110, pages 904 - 910 | - CIRCULATION, (2007), vol. 16, pages 1449 - 1457 | - KURRIAR ET AL., J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL, (2009), vol. 20, pages 796 - 802 | - BURASHNIKOV, (2007), vol. 116, pages 1449 - 1457 | - KUMAR ET AL., J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL, (2009), vol. 20, pages 796 - 802 | - SONG ET AL., AM.1 PHYSIOL, (2008), vol. 294, pages H2031 - 2039 | - LI ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2000), vol. 101, pages 2631 - 2638 | - VERHEULE, CIRCULATION, (2003), vol. 107, pages 2615 - 2622 | - KISTLER ET AL., EUR HEART J, (2006), vol. 27, pages 3045 - 3056 | - KIRCHHOF ET AL., J CARDIOVASC. ELECTROPHYSIOL, (2003), vol. 14, pages 1027 - 1033 | - VAN WAGONER D., J CARDIOVASC PHARM, (2008), vol. 52, pages 306 - 313 | - GO AS; HYLEK EM; PHILLIPS KA; CHANG Y; HENAULT LE; SELBY JV; SINGER DE., "Prevalence of diagnosed atrial fibrillation in adults: national implications for rhythm management and stroke prevention: the AnTicoagulation and Risk Factors in Atrial Fibrillation (ATRIA) Study", JAMA, (2001), vol. 285, pages 2370 - 2375 | - N ENGL J MED., (2009), vol. 360, pages 1811 - 1813 | - PICCINI JP; HASSELBLAD V; PETERSON ED; WASHAM JB; CALIFF RM; KONG DF., "Comparative efficacy of dronedarone and amiodarone for the maintenance of sinus rhythm in patients with atrial fibrillation", JAM COLL CARDIOL., (2009), vol. 54, pages 1089 - 1095 | - TOUBOUL P; BRUGADA J; CAPUCCI A; CRIJNS HJ; EDVARDSSON N; HOHNLOSER SH., "Dronedarone for prevention of atrial fibrillation: a dose- ranging study", EUR HEART J., (2003), vol. 24, pages 1481 - 1487 | - SINGH BN; CONNOLLY SJ; CRIJNS HJ; ROY D; KOWEY PR; CAPUCCI A; RADZIK D; ALIOT EM; HOHNLOSER SH., "Dronedarone for maintenance of sinus rhythm in atrial fibrillation or flutter", N ENGL J MED., (2007), vol. 357, pages 987 - 999 | - DAVY JM; HEROLD M; HOGLUND C; TIMMERMANS A; ALINGS A; RADZIK D; VAN KL., "Dronedarone for the control of ventricular rate in permanent atrial fibrillation: the Efficacy and safety of dRonedArone for the control of ventricular rate during atrial fibrillation (ERATO) study", AM HEART J., (2008), vol. 156 | - KOBER L; TORP-PEDERSEN C; MCMURRAY JJ; GOTZSCHE 0; LEVY S; CRIJNS H; AMLIE J; CARLSEN J., "Increased mortality after dronedarone therapy for severe heart failure", N ENGL J MED., (2008), vol. 358, pages 2678 - 2687 | - HOHNLOSER SH; CRIJNS HJ; VAN EM; GAUDIN C; PAGE RL; TORP-PEDERSEN C; CONNOLLY SJ., "Effect of dronedarone on cardiovascular events in atrial fibrillation", N ENGL JMED., (2009), vol. 360, pages 668 - 678 | - BURASHNIKOV A; DI DIEGO JM; ZYGMUNT AC; BELARDINELLI L; ANTZELEVITCH C., "Atrium-selective sodium channel block as a strategy for suppression of atrial fibrillation: differences in sodium channel inactivation between atria and ventricles and the role of ranolazine", CIRCULATION, (2007), vol. 116, pages 1449 - 1457 | - BURASHNIKOV A; DI DIEGO JM; SICOURI S; FERREIRO M; CARLSSON L; ANTZELEVITCH C., "Atrial-selective effects of chronic amiodarone in the management of atrial fibrillation", HEART RHYTHM., (2008), vol. 5, pages 1735 - 1742 | - SICOURI S; GLASS A; BELARDINELLI L; ANTZELEVITCH C., "Antiarrhythmic effects of ranolazine in canine pulmonary vein sleeve preparations", HEART RHYTHM., (2008), vol. 5, pages 1019 - 1026 | - SICOURI S; BELARDINELLI L; CARLSSON L; ANTZELEVITCH C., "Potent antiarrhythmic effects of chronic amiodarone in canine pulmonary vein sleeve preparations", J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL., (2009), vol. 20, pages 803 - 810 | - KUMAR K; NEARING BD; CARVAS M; NASCIMENTO BC; ACAR M; BELARDINELLI L; VERRIER RL., "Ranolazine exerts potent effects on atrial electrical properties and abbreviates atrial fibrillation duration in the intact porcine heart", J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL., (2009), vol. 20, pages 796 - 802 | - ANTZELEVITCH C; BELARDINELLI L; ZYGMUNT AC; BURASHNIKOV A; DI DIEGO JM; FISH JM; CORDEIRO JM; THOMAS GP., "Electrophysiologic effects of ranolazine: a novel anti-anginal agent with antiarrhythmic properties", CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 110, pages 904 - 910 | - BURASHNIKOV A; MANNAVA S; ANTZELEVITCH C., "Transmembrane action potential heterogeneity in the canine isolated arterially-perfused atrium: effect ofIKr and Ito/IKur block", AM J PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 286, pages H2393 - H2400 | - PATTERSON E; PO SS; SCHERLAG BJ; LAZZARA R., "Triggered firing in pulmonary veins initiated by in vitro autonomic nerve stimulation", HEART RHYTHM., (2005), vol. 2, pages 624 - 631 | - PATTERSON E; LAZZARA R; SZABO B; LIU H; TANG D; LI YH; SCHERLAG BJ; PO SS, "Sodium-calcium exchange initiated by the Ca2+ transient: an arrhythmia trigger within pulmonary veins.", J AM COLL CARDIOL., (2006), vol. 47, pages 1196 - 1206 | - CHEN YJ; CHEN SA; CHANG MS; LIN CI., "Arrhythmogenic activity of cardiac muscle in pulmonary veins of the dog: implication for the genesis of atrial fibrillation", CARDIOVASC RES., (2000), vol. 48, pages 265 - 273 | - CHEN YJ; CHEN SA., "Electrophysiology of pulmonary veins", J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL., (2006), vol. 17, pages 220 - 224 | - FUSTER V; RYDEN LE; CANNOM DS; CRIJNS HJ; CURTIS AB; ELLENBOGEN KA; HALPERIN JL; LE HEUZEY JY; KAY GN; LOWE JE, "ACC/AHA/ESC", JAM COLL CARDIOL., (2006), vol. 48, pages 854 - 906 | - REIFFEL, J. A., "Rate versus rhythm control pharmacotherapy for atrial fibrillation: where are we in 2008?", [11] JOURNAL, (2008), vol. 1, pages 31 - 47 | - NACCARELLI GV; GONZALEZ MD., "Atrial fibrillation and the expanding role of catheter ablation: do antiarrhythmic drugs have a future?", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (2008), vol. 52, pages 203 - 209 | - CAIN ME; CURTIS AB., "Rhythm control in atrial fibrillation--one setback after another", NENGL JMED., (2008), vol. 358, pages 2725 - 2727 | - SAVELIEVA I; CAMM J., "Anti-arrhythmic drug therapy for atrial fibrillation: current anti-arrhythmic drugs, investigational agents, and innovative approaches", EUROPACE, vol. 200R, no. 10, pages 647 - 665 | - HAISSAGUERRE M; JAIS P; SHAH DC; TAKAHASHI A; HOCINI M; QUINIOU G; GARRIGUE S; LE MOUROUX A; LE METAYER P; CLEMENTY J., "Spontaneous initiation of atrial fibrillation by ectopic beats originating in the pulmonary veins", N ENGL J MED., (1998), vol. 339, pages 659 - 666 | - SHAH DC; HAISSAGUERRE M; JAIS P; CLEMENTY J., "High- resolution mapping of tachycardia originating from the superior vena cava: evidence of electrical heterogeneity, slow conduction, and possible circus movement reentry", J CARDIOVASC ELECTROPHYSIOL., (2002), vol. L3, pages 388 - 392 | - NATTEL S; SHIROSHITA-TAKESHITA A; BRUNDEL BJ; RIVARD L., "Mechanisms of atrial fibrillation: lessons from animal models", PROG CARDIOVASC DIS., (2005), vol. 48, pages 9 - 28 | - ANTZELEVITCH C; BURASHNIKOV A., "Atrial-selective sodium channel block as a novel strategy for the management of atrial fibrillation", J ELECTROCARDIOL., (2009), vol. 42, pages 543 - 548 | - VARRO A; TAKACS J; NEMETH M; HALA 0; VIRAG L; LOST N; BALATI B; AGOSTON M; VERECKEI A; PASTOR G, "Electrophysiological effects of dronedarone (SR 33589), a noniodinated amiodarone derivative in the canine heart: comparison with amiodarone", BR J PHARMACOL., (2001), vol. 133, pages 625 - 634 | - GAUTIER P; GUILLEMARE E; MARION A; BERTRAND JP; TOURNEUR Y; NISATO D., "Electrophysiologic characterization of dronedarone in guinea pig ventricular cells", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 41, pages 191 - 202 | - SUN W; SARMA JS; SINGH BN., "Electrophysiological effects of dronedarone (SR33589), a noniodinated benzofuran derivative, in the rabbit heart : comparison with amiodarone", CIRCULATION, (1999), vol. 100, pages 2276 - 2281 | - SUN W; SARMA JS; SINGH BN., "Chronic and acute effects of dronedarone on the action potential of rabbit atrial muscle preparations: comparison with amiodarone", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (2002), vol. 39, pages 677 - 684 | - MORO S; FERREIRO M; CELESTINO D; MEDEI E; ELIZARI MV; SICOURI S., "In vitro effects of acute amiodarone and dronedarone on epicardial, endocardial, and M cells of the canine ventricle", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL THER., (2007), vol. 12, pages 314 - 321 | - MANNING A; THISSE V; HODEIGE D; RICHARD J; HEYNDRICKX JP; CHATELAIN P., "SR 33589, a new amiodarone-like antiarrhythmic agent: electrophysiological effects in anesthetized dogs", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 25, pages 252 - 261 | - VERDUYN SC; VOS MA; LEUNISSEN HD; VAN OPSTAL JM; WELLENS HJ., "Evaluation of the acute electrophysiologic effects of intravenous dronedarone, an amiodarone-like agent, with special emphasis on ventricular repolarization and acquired torsade de pointes arrhythmias", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 33, pages 212 - 222 | - FINANCE 0; MANNING A; CHATELAIN P., "Effects of a new amiodarone-like agent, SR 33589, in comparison to amiodarone, D,L-sotalol, and lignocaine, on ischemia-induced ventricular arrhythmias in anesthetized pigs.", CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (1995), vol. 26, pages 570 - 576 | - SINGH BN., "Amiodarone as paradigm for developing new drugs for atrial fibrillation", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL., (2008), vol. 52, pages 300 - 305 | - SCIRICA BM; MORROW DA; HOD H; MURPHY SA; BELARDINELLI L; HEDGEPETH CM; MOLHOEK P; VERHEUGT FW; GERSH BJ; MCCABE CH, CIRCULATION, (2007), vol. 116, pages 1647 - 1652 | - MURDOCK DK; OVERTON N; KERSTEN M; KALIEBE J; DEVECCHI F., "The effect of ranolazine on maintaining sinus rhythm in patients with resistant atrial fibrillation", INDIAN PACING ELECTROPHYSIOL J., (2008), vol. 8, pages 175 - 181 | - MURDOCK DK; KERSTEN M; KALIEBE J; LARRIAN G., "The use of oral ranolazine to convert new or paroxysmal atrial fibrillation: a reveiw of experience with implications for possible "pill in the pocket" approach to atrial fibrillation", INDIAN PACING ELECTROPHYSIOL J., (2009), vol. 9, pages 260 - 267 | - GOLDSCHLAGER N; EPSTEIN AE; NACCARELLI GV; OLSHANSKY B; SINGH B; COLLARD HR; MURPHY E., "A practical guide for clinicians who treat patients with amiodarone: 2007", HEART RHYTHM., (2007), vol. 4, pages 1250 - 1259 | - BARDY GH; LEE KL; MARK DB; POOLE JE; PACKER DL; BOINEAU R; DOMANSKI M; TROUTMAN C; ANDERSON J; JOHNSON G, "Amiodarone or an implantable cardioverter-defibrillator for congestive heart failure", N ENGL JMED., (2005), vol. 352, pages 225 - 237 | - CONNOLLY SJ; CRIJNS HJ; TORP-PEDERSEN C; VAN EM; GAUDIN C; PAGE RL; HOHNLOSER SH., "Analysis of stroke in ATHENA: a placebo-controlled, double-blind, parallel-arm trial to assess the efficacy of dronedarone 400 mg BID for the prevention of cardiovascular hospitalization or death from any cause in patients with atrial fibrillation/atrial flutter", CIRCULATION, (2009), vol. 120, pages 1174 - 1180 | - KOREN MJ; CRAGER MR; SWEENEY M., "Long-term safety of a novel antianginal agent in patients with severe chronic stable angina: the Ranolazine Open Label Experience (ROLE)", J AM COLL CARDIOL., (2007), vol. 49, pages 1027 - 1034 | - CHAITMAN BR., "Ranolazine for the treatment of chronic angina and potential use in other cardiovascular conditions", CIRCULATION, (2006), vol. 113, pages 2462 - 2472 | - MALTSEV VA; SABBAH HN; UNDROVINAS AL., "Late sodium current is a novel target for amiodarone: studies in failing human myocardium", J MOL CELL CARDIOL., (2001), vol. 33, pages 923 - 932 | - ANTZELEVITCH C., "Electrical heterogeneity, cardiac arrhythmias, and the sodium channel", CIRC RES., (2000), vol. 87, pages 964 - 965 | - ANTZELEVITCH C; BELARDINELLI L; WU L; FRASER H; ZYGMUNT AC; BURASHNIKOV A; DI DIEGO JM; FISH JM; CORDEIRO JM; GOODROW RJ, "Electrophysiologic properties and antiarrhythmic actions of a novel anti- anginal agent.", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL THERAPEUT., (2004), vol. 9, no. 1, pages S65 - 583 | - SHRYOCK JC; BELARDINELLI L., "Inhibition of late sodium current to reduce electrical and mechanical dysfunction of ischaemic myocardium", BR J PHARMACOL., (2008), vol. 153, pages 1128 - 1132 | - BURASHNIKOV A; ANTZELEVITCH C., "Atrial-selective sodium channel block for the treatment of atrial fibrillation", EXPERT OPIN EMERY DRUGS., (2009), vol. 14, pages 233 - 249 | - PAPPONE C; SANTINELLI V; MANGUSO F; VICEDOMINI G; GUGLIOTTA F; AUGELLO G; MAZZONE P; TORTORIELLO V; LANDONI G; ZANGRILLO A, "Pulmonary vein denervation enhances long-term benefit after circumferential ablation for paroxysmal atrial fibrillation", CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 109, pages 327 - 334 |