EP2490749 - GUIDE TUBE FOR NEEDLES OF A TATTOO MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/35] | GUIDE TUBE FOR TATTOO MACHINE NEEDLES | ||
[2013/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Surbone, Andrea Via Mazzini 92 Alpignano / IT | [2012/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/35] | Representative(s) | Lovino, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2012/35] | Application number, filing date | 10798584.8 | 21.10.2010 | WO2010IB02707 | Priority number, date | IT2009TO00808 | 23.10.2009 Original published format: IT TO20090808 | [2012/35] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011048482 | Date: | 28.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2490749 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2490749 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
A61M37/0076 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSROHR FÜR TÄTOWIERUNGSMASCHINENNADELN | [2012/35] | English: | GUIDE TUBE FOR NEEDLES OF A TATTOO MACHINE | [2013/11] | French: | TUBE DE GUIDAGE CONCU POUR DES AIGUILLES DE MACHINES A TATOUER | [2012/35] |
Former [2012/35] | GUIDE TUBE FOR TATTOO MACHINE NEEDLES | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 25.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2010 | AL | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | HR | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | MK | 14.08.2013 | MT | 14.08.2013 | PL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | SM | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | IE | 21.10.2013 | NO | 14.11.2013 | RS | 14.11.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MK | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
TR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
RS | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MK | 14.08.2013 | ||
MT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
RS | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 21.10.2010 | |
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MK | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
RS | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
MK | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
SM | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
IE | 21.10.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 14.08.2013 | |
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 14.08.2013 | |
HR | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 14.08.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 14.08.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | |
NO | 14.11.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 14.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO02096499 (MERKEL SYLVIE [FR]) [A] 1-10 * pages 2,3; figure - *; | [A]US2003171767 (KOPLEN MICHAEL L [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0035] - [0044]; figure - *; | [A]US3228269 (DON HEYER) [A] 1-7 * figure - *; | [A]US2743444 (THOMAS BERTRAM M) [A] 1-7 * column 1; figure - *; | [A]US3979978 (SMOLIK ROBERT A) [A] 1,2 * figure - *; | [A]US2004186501 (SU CHIN KUEI [TW]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | US7207242 |