EP2536268 - SHAPING AND COOLING DEVICE FOR A FLOWABLE, MELTED FOOD MASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hochland SE Kemptener Strasse 17 88178 Heimenkirch / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Hochland SE Kemptener Strasse 17 88178 Heimenkirch/Allgäu / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIGGEL, Andreas Schwarzensee 3 1/2 88145 Hergatz / DE | 02 /
STADELMANN, Franz Schrundholz 93 88145 Opfenbach / DE | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Hoefer & Partner Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10798731.5 | 14.12.2010 | WO2010EP07617 | Priority number, date | DE20101007984 | 15.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010007984 | [2012/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011098108 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2536268 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2536268 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01J25/12 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
A01J25/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORM- UND KÜHLVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE FLIESSFÄHIGE, AUFGESCHMOLZENE LEBENSMITTELMASSE | [2012/52] | English: | SHAPING AND COOLING DEVICE FOR A FLOWABLE, MELTED FOOD MASS | [2012/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORMAGE ET DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR UNE COMPOSITION ALIMENTAIRE FONDUE ET COULANTE | [2012/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 16.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2010 | AL | 15.10.2014 | BG | 15.10.2014 | CY | 15.10.2014 | CZ | 15.10.2014 | DK | 15.10.2014 | EE | 15.10.2014 | ES | 15.10.2014 | FI | 15.10.2014 | HR | 15.10.2014 | IT | 15.10.2014 | LT | 15.10.2014 | LV | 15.10.2014 | MC | 15.10.2014 | MK | 15.10.2014 | MT | 15.10.2014 | NL | 15.10.2014 | PL | 15.10.2014 | RO | 15.10.2014 | RS | 15.10.2014 | SE | 15.10.2014 | SI | 15.10.2014 | SK | 15.10.2014 | SM | 15.10.2014 | TR | 15.10.2014 | IE | 14.12.2014 | LU | 14.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | FR | 31.12.2014 | GB | 15.01.2015 | NO | 15.01.2015 | GR | 16.01.2015 | IS | 15.02.2015 | PT | 16.02.2015 | DE | 01.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MK | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
DE | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
MT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
TR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
DE | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
BG | 15.10.2014 | ||
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
DE | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 15.10.2014 | |
CY | 15.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
DE | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
MC | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
DE | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
SM | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
DE | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SI | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
DE | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
DE | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
GB | 15.01.2015 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
DE | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
DE | 01.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
IT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
SK | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
CZ | 15.10.2014 | ||
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RO | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
DK | 15.10.2014 | ||
EE | 15.10.2014 | ||
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 15.10.2014 | |
ES | 15.10.2014 | ||
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
HR | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
LV | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
PL | 15.10.2014 | ||
RS | 15.10.2014 | ||
SE | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
GR | 16.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 15.10.2014 | |
FI | 15.10.2014 | ||
LT | 15.10.2014 | ||
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
IS | 15.02.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
PT | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
NO | 15.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 15.10.2014 | |
NL | 15.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 15.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005000012 (NATEC REICH SUMMER GMBH CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7,10 * pages 8,9; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4004870 (GUTTINGER MANFRED, et al) [Y] 1-7,10 * column 2, lines 6-13,27-34; figure 1 *; | [A]US4696779 (WIDEMAN RONALD H [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002027309 (FUJII ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | JPH10277624 | US6264767 | by applicant | DE10328905 |