EP2519706 - DRIVE PIN SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlas Copco Secoroc LLC 1600 South Great Southwest Parkway Grand Prairie, TX 75051 / US | [2012/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLFER, Richard, Dale 2808 Simms Circle Salem VA 24153 / US | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 7086 103 87 Stockholm / SE | [2012/45] | Application number, filing date | 10798942.8 | 30.12.2010 | WO2010US62505 | Priority number, date | US20090650704 | 31.12.2009 Original published format: US 650704 | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011082302 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2519706 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2519706 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/046, E21B4/06, E21B10/36 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
E21B17/046 (EP,US);
E21B10/36 (EP,US);
E21B4/06 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17794 (US);
Y10T279/17931 (US);
Y10T29/49826 (US);
|
Former IPC [2012/45] | E21B17/046 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STÜTZE FÜR EINEN MITNEHMERBOLZEN | [2012/45] | English: | DRIVE PIN SUPPORT | [2012/45] | French: | SUPPORT DE BROCHE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 05.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2010 | AL | 12.02.2014 | AT | 12.02.2014 | BE | 12.02.2014 | BG | 12.02.2014 | CY | 12.02.2014 | CZ | 12.02.2014 | DK | 12.02.2014 | EE | 12.02.2014 | ES | 12.02.2014 | FI | 12.02.2014 | HR | 12.02.2014 | IT | 12.02.2014 | LT | 12.02.2014 | LV | 12.02.2014 | MC | 12.02.2014 | MK | 12.02.2014 | MT | 12.02.2014 | NL | 12.02.2014 | RO | 12.02.2014 | RS | 12.02.2014 | SI | 12.02.2014 | SK | 12.02.2014 | SM | 12.02.2014 | TR | 12.02.2014 | NO | 12.05.2014 | GR | 13.05.2014 | IS | 12.06.2014 | PT | 12.06.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 12.02.2014 | ||
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MK | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
TR | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 12.02.2014 | ||
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
MT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
TR | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.12.2010 | |
AT | 12.02.2014 | ||
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
SM | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
IT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RS | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.02.2014 | |
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [I]US4919221 (PASCALE JACK H [US]) [I] 1-22 * column 4, line 7 - column 5, line 45 ** figures 2,4,8,9,11 * | by applicant | US2008078584 | US20090369579 |