EP2456274 - METHOD FOR ADJUSTING CHANNELS IN COGNITIVE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION, AND COGNITIVE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM CAPABLE OF IMPLEMENTING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Information and Communication Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states National Institute of Information and Communication Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Chen c/o National Institute of Information and Communications Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | 02 /
DEMESSIE, Yohannes Alemseged c/o National Institute of Information and Communications Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | 03 /
TRAN, Ha Nguyen c/o National Institute of Information and Communications Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | 04 /
HARADA, Hiroshi c/o National Institute of Information and Communications Technology 4-2-1 Nukui-Kitamachi Koganei-shi Tokyo 184-8795 / JP | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/21] | Pitchford, James Edward, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10799645.6 | 16.07.2010 | WO2010JP04618 | Priority number, date | JP20090169434 | 17.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009169434 | [2012/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011007581 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2456274 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14, H04W72/08 | [2017/23] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP,US);
H04W16/02 (KR);
H04W72/04 (KR);
H04W72/541 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/21] | H04W72/08, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KANALEINSTELLUNG IN EINER KOGNITIVEN DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION SOWIE SYSTEM FÜR KOGNITIVE DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION MIT MÖGLICHKEIT ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2012/21] | English: | METHOD FOR ADJUSTING CHANNELS IN COGNITIVE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION, AND COGNITIVE WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM CAPABLE OF IMPLEMENTING THE METHOD | [2012/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE DE CANAUX DANS UNE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL COGNITIVE ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL COGNITIF CAPABLE DE METTRE EN UVRE LE PROCÉDÉ | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2012 | Translation filed | 08.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 12.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 12.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1944996 (ST MICROELECTRONICS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0022] - [0045] * * page 1 * [I] 3,4; | [A]US2009034508 (GURNEY DAVID P [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0020] - [0033] ** figure 1 *; | [XI]US2009117914 (KWON TAE SOO [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0041] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 3,4 | International search | [A]WO2008119381 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al); | [A]WO2009084465 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [XP] - ALEMSEGED YOHANNES D. ET AL., "Auxiliary Control Channel for Spectrum Sensing in Cognitive Radio Systems", IEICE TECHNICAL REPORT, (20090722), vol. 109, no. 155, pages 139 - 144, XP008150358 | by applicant | - M. INOUE ET AL., "Novel Out-of-Band Signaling for Seamless Interworking between Heterogeneous Networks", IEEE WIRELESS COMMUN., (200404), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/MWC.2004.1295740, pages 56 - 63, XP001196400 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWC.2004.1295740 |