EP2455636 - SHOCK ABSORBING MEMBER AND SHOCK ABSORBING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nifco INC. 184-1, Maioka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8522 / JP | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Takahiro c/o NIFCO INC. 184-1, Maioka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8522 / JP | 02 /
FUKUO, Michihiro c/o NIFCO INC. 184-1, Maioka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8522 / JP | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Gassner, Wolfgang Dr. Gassner & Partner Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10799902.1 | 15.07.2010 | WO2010JP62009 | Priority number, date | JP20090166824 | 15.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009166824 | [2012/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011007844 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2455636 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/12, B60J5/00, B60R21/04, F16F7/00, B60J5/04 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
B60J5/0451 (EP,US);
F16F7/121 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/21] | F16F7/12, B60J5/00, B60R21/04, F16F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Title | German: | STOSSDÄMPFENDES ELEMENT UND STOSSDÄMPFENDE STRUKTUR | [2012/21] | English: | SHOCK ABSORBING MEMBER AND SHOCK ABSORBING STRUCTURE | [2012/21] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ABSORPTION DE CHOC ET STRUCTURE D'ABSORPTION DE CHOC | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2012 | Translation filed | 19.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 11.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/49] | 16.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1129873 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] , [0037] ** figures 1,2,16,18 * | International search | [A]JPH08188052 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [A]JPH0948301 (INOUE MTP KK); | [X]JPH0971200 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2001239834 (MAZDA MOTOR) | by applicant | JP3575096B | JP3873565B | JP2009051251 |