EP2448900 - ANIONIC POLYMERIZATION INITIATORS AND PROCESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2017/17] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAN, Yuan-Yong Bridgestone Americas Center for Research and Technology 1655 South Main Street Akron, Ohio 44301 / US | 02 /
QIN, Zengquan Bridgestone Americas Center for Research&Technology 1655 South Main Street Akron, Ohio 44301 / US | 03 /
PAN, Xiao-Dong Bridgestone Americas Center for Research&Technology 1655 South Main Street Akron, Ohio 44301 / US | 04 /
ROGGEMAN, David M. Firestone Polymers 381 West Wilbeth Road Akron, Ohio 44301 / US | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/17] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2014/30] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/49] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/19] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10800273.4 | 28.06.2010 | [2017/17] | WO2010US40242 | Priority number, date | US20090221622P | 30.06.2009 Original published format: US 221622 P | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011008501 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2448900 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2448900 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08F36/04, C08F4/48, C07F1/02 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
C08F4/48 (EP,KR,US);
C07C43/235 (KR);
C07C41/18 (KR);
C07F1/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F36/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08F4/484 (US);
C08F12/08 (US);
C08F136/04 (US);
C08F236/04 (US);
C08F2810/40 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F236/10, C08F4/48 (US,EP);
C08F36/04, C08F4/48 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2012/19] | C07C43/235, C07C41/18, C07C1/207, C07F1/02, C08F36/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANIONISCHE POLYMERISIERUNGSHEMMER UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/19] | English: | ANIONIC POLYMERIZATION INITIATORS AND PROCESSES | [2012/19] | French: | INITIATEURS DE POLYMÉRISATION ANIONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 20.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2010 | AL | 26.04.2017 | AT | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | NL | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | IE | 28.06.2017 | LU | 28.06.2017 | MT | 28.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.06.2010 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 28.06.2010 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 28.06.2010 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.06.2010 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.06.2010 | |
AT | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
IE | 28.06.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
LU | 28.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NL | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | NL | 26.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0453807 ; | [X]JP2003171422 ; | [X]EP0455191 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 5, line 15 - line 30; claims 1-9 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 14, Database accession no. 1992-110698, XP002725772 & JPH0453807 A 19920221 (NIPPON SODA CO) [X] 1-15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 12, Database accession no. 2004-112462, XP002725773 & JP2003171422 A 20030620 (TOHO CHEM IND CO LTD) [X] 1-15 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US3668263 (MORRISON ROBERT C, et al); | [A]US4006187 (KAMIENSKI CONRAD W, et al) | [X] - KEI MATSUZAKI ET AL., "Excees charge distribution in poly(o-methoxystyryl) carbanions", MARKROMOL. CHEM., RAPID COMMUN., (1986), vol. 7, pages 713 - 718, XP008148515 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/marc.1986.030071106 | by applicant | US3109871 | US4647625 | US4677153 | US5109907 | US6977281 | WO2009086490 | JP2003171422 | EP0455191 | US3668263 | US4006187 | US4429091 | US7442748 | US6897270 | US5489660 | US4015061 | US4616069 | US4935471 | US5153159 | US5149457 | US5196138 | US5329005 | US5496940 | US5502131 | US5567815 | US5610227 | US5663398 | US5786441 | US6812295 | US7153919 | US2007149744 | US2007037956 | US2007078232 | US2008027171 | US3873489 | US3978103 | US3997581 | US4002594 | US5580919 | US5583245 | US5663396 | US5684171 | US5684172 | US5696197 | US6525118 | - The Vanderbilt Rubber Handbook, (1990), pages 603 - 04 | - K. MATSUZAKI ET AL., "Excess charge distribution in poly(o-methoxystyryl) carbanions", MAKROMOL. CHEM., RAPID COMMUN., (1986), vol. 7, pages 713 - 18 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., vol. 60, page 309 | - KIRK-OTHMER, Encyclopedia of Chem. Tech., WILEY INTERSCIENCE, (1982), vol. 20, pages 365 - 468 | - J.J. BRENNAN ET AL., RUBBER CHEM. AND TECH., (1967), vol. 40, page 817 |