EP2453801 - ULTRASOUND PROBE AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carefusion 209, Inc. 3750 Torrey View Court San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEASTY, Ray 5411 Hillside Court McFarland Wisconsin 53558 / US | 02 /
POOLE, Tony 18 Springfields Tetbury Gloucestershire GL8 8EN / GB | 03 /
ZEISLER, Christina W9663 E. Main Street Cambridge Wisconsin 53523 / US | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10800326.0 | 06.07.2010 | WO2010US41075 | Priority number, date | US20090503352 | 15.07.2009 Original published format: US 503352 | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011008594 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2453801 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, G01N29/24 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
A61B8/4455 (EP,US);
G01N29/24 (KR);
A61B8/00 (KR);
A61B8/488 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLSONDE UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/21] | English: | ULTRASOUND PROBE AND METHOD OF USING THE SAME | [2012/21] | French: | SONDE ULTRASONORE ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 09.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/52] | 01.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4355643 (LAUGHLIN DONALD E, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 15 - column 4, line 54 *; | [I]US4424814 (SECUNDA JEFFREY [US]) [I] 1,11 * abstract * * column 7, line 31 - column 7, line 45 *; | [I]US4869260 (YOUNG DONALD F [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 28 - column 5, line 20 *; | [A]US2004102707 (MURKIN JOHN M [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0048] *; | [A]WO2006091093 (ENRAF NONIUS B V [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2006241459 (TAI ALAN C [CA]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0117] * | International search | [A]US4503861 (ENTREKIN ROBERT R [US]); | [A]US4869260 (YOUNG DONALD F [US], et al); | [A]WO2006091093 (ENRAF NONIUS B V [NL], et al); | [A]US2006241459 (TAI ALAN C [CA]) |