EP2515922 - PLANT EXTRACT FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE ILLNESSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/44] | PLANT EXTRACTS FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASES | ||
[2013/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finzelberg GmbH & Co. KG Koblenzer Strasse 48-56 56626 Andernach / DE | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALBROEL, Bernd Flurgasse 48 53639 Königswinter / DE | 02 /
FEISTEL, Björn Im Boden 32 56626 Andernach / DE | 03 /
PAHNKE, Jens Zum Fuchsbau 6 18147 Rostock / DE | [2011/33] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10800741.0 | 22.12.2010 | WO2010EP70531 | Priority number, date | EP20090180627 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: EP 09180627 | [2011/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011076867 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2515922 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2515922 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/53, A61P25/28 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
A61K36/53 (EP,US);
A61K36/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/38 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/33] | A61K36/53 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFLANZENEXTRAKTE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEURODEGENERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2012/44] | English: | PLANT EXTRACT FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE ILLNESSES | [2013/20] | French: | EXTRAITS DE PLANTES DESTINÉS AU TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES NEURODÉGÉNÉRATIVES | [2013/20] |
Former [2012/44] | PLANT EXTRACTS FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISEASES | ||
Former [2012/44] | EXTRAITS VÉGÉTAUX POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES NEURODÉGÉNÉRATIVES | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 31.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.07.2013 | Observations by third parties | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2010 | AL | 02.10.2013 | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | DK | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | HR | 02.10.2013 | IT | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MK | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | NL | 02.10.2013 | RO | 02.10.2013 | RS | 02.10.2013 | SE | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SK | 02.10.2013 | SM | 02.10.2013 | IE | 22.12.2013 | LU | 22.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | NO | 01.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
AL | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2018/46] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
AL | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.12.2010 | |
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IE | 22.12.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
IT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
LU | 22.12.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 02.10.2013 | |
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RS | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102004032165 (KNOERLE RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * abstract *; | [I] - RAINER KNÖRLE ET AL, "Extrakte aus Sideritis ssp. (griechischer Bergtee): Innovative zentral aktive Pflanzenextrakte mit breitem Wirkprofil", INTERNET CITATION, (20091001), pages 1 - 15, URL: http://ibam.de/pics/Poster-Wolnzach-2009.pdf, (20100708), XP002591208 [I] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1054682 | - R. BROOKMEYER, "Forecasting the global burden of Alzheimer's disease", ALZHEIMER'S AND DEMENTIA, (200703), vol. 3, pages 186 - 191 | - CORDER, E.H. ET AL., "Gene dose of apolipoprotein E type 4 allele and the risk of Alzheimer's disease in late onset families", SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, no. 5123, pages 921 - 923 | - BU, G., "Apolipoprotein E and its receptors in Alzheimer's disease: pathways, pathogenesis and therapy", NAT. REV. NEUROSCI., (2009), vol. 10, no. 5, pages 333 - 344 | - CURRENT ALZHEIMER RESEARCH, vol. 5, pages 396 - 406 | - PAHNKE ET AL., "Alzheimer's disease and blood-brain barrier function - Why have anti-ß-amyloid therapies failed to prevent dementia progression?", NEUROSCIBIOBEHAVR, (2009), vol. 33, pages 1099 - 1108 | - DEKOSKY ET AL., "Ginkgo biloba for Prevention of Dementia: A Randomized Controlled Trial", JAMA, (2008), vol. 300, no. 19, pages 2253 - 2262 | - SILVA ET AL., NEUROTOXICITY RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 119 - 130 | - JOHNE ET AL., BGBL, (2003), vol. 46, pages 1061 - 1067 | - MOORE ET AL., "St.John's wort induces hepatic drug metabolism through activation of the pregnane X receptor", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 7500 - 7502 | - PAHNKE ET AL., "Clinico-pathological function of cerebral ABC transporters - implications for the pathogenesis of Alzheimer's disease", CURRENT ALZHEIMER RESEARCH, (2008), vol. 5, pages 396 - 406 | - OAKLEY H. ET AL., "Intraneuronal beta-amyloid aggregates, neurodegeneration, and neuron loss in transgenic mice with five familial Alzheimer's disease mutations: potential factors in amyloid plaque formation", J NEUROSCI, (2006), vol. 26, no. 40, pages 10129 - 40 | - SILVA, B. ET AL., NEUROTOXICITY RESEARCH, (2004), pages 119 - 130 | other | - CHOW T.W. ET AL, "Potential cognitive enhancing and disease modification effects of SSRIs for Alzheimer's disease.", NEUROPSYCHIATRIC DISEASE AND TREATMENT, (2007), vol. 3, no. 5, pages 627 - 636, XP055073186 | - LEHR T. ET AL, "Population pharmacokinetic modelling of NS2330 (tesofensine) and its major metabolite in patients with Alzheimer's disease.", BR J CLIN PHARMACOL, (20070223), vol. 64, no. 1, pages 36 - 48, XP055073189 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2125.2007.02855.x | - MARKS D.M. ET AL, "Triple reuptake inhibitors: A premise and promise.", PSYCHIATRY INVEST, (2008), vol. 5, pages 142 - 147, XP055073197 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4306/pi.2008.5.3.142 | - NITSCH R.M. ET AL, "SEROTONIN 5-HT2A AND 5-HT2C RECEPTORS STIMULATE AMYLOID PRECURSOR PROTEIN ECTODOMAIN SECRETION.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19960223), vol. 271, no. 8, pages 4188 - 4194, XP001149842 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.8.4188 | - PAKASKI M.ET AL, "Imipramine and citalopram facilitate amyloid precursor protein secretion in vitro.", NEUROCHEMISTRY INTERNATIONAL, (2005), vol. 47, pages 190 - 195, XP027856727 |