EP2498624 - HYDROSOL BASED FLAVOR DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Philip Morris Products S.A. Quai Jeanrenaud 3 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASOULI, Firooz 1807Gildenborough Court Midlothian, VA 23113 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Wei-Jun 2537 Lochness Road Richmond, VA 23235 / US | 03 /
REGRUT, Jon 702 S Nansemond Street Richmond, VA 23221 / US | 04 /
PFLUEGER, James 1708 Swift Circle 201 Midlothian, VA 23114 / US | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2012/38] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10800779.0 | 10.11.2010 | [2017/11] | WO2010IB02993 | Priority number, date | US20090259862P | 10.11.2009 Original published format: US 259862 P | [2012/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011058435 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2498624 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2498624 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, A24F47/00, A23L27/00, A61M16/00 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
A23P30/40 (EP,US);
A61M15/06 (US);
A23L27/00 (EP,US);
A23L27/80 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
A61M2016/0024 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/38] | A23L1/22, A24F47/00, A61M15/00, A23L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUF HYDROSOL BASIERENDE GESCHMACKSFREISETZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2012/38] | English: | HYDROSOL BASED FLAVOR DELIVERY DEVICE | [2012/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION D'UN PARFUM À BASE D'HYDROSOL | [2012/38] | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 21.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.11.2010 | AL | 15.03.2017 | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | MK | 15.03.2017 | RS | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | SM | 15.03.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | IE | 10.11.2017 | LU | 10.11.2017 | MT | 10.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.11.2017 | ||
LU | 10.11.2017 | ||
MT | 10.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.11.2017 | ||
LU | 10.11.2017 | ||
MT | 10.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.11.2010 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.11.2017 | ||
LU | 10.11.2017 | ||
MT | 10.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.11.2017 | ||
LU | 10.11.2017 | ||
MT | 10.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
IE | 10.11.2017 | ||
LU | 10.11.2017 | ||
MT | 10.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.11.2017 | ||
MT | 10.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
LU | 10.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4576157 (RAGHUPRASAD PUTHALATH K [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0390217 (KIKKOMAN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-20 * figure 1; claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0503767 (PHILIP MORRIS [US]) [A] 1,8* figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [XI]WO2009001082 (KIND CONSUMER LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8,9,20 * page 6, line 15 - line 20; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 7,10-19 |