EP2457037 - DEMAND FLOW PUMPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Industry, Inc. 100 Technology Drive Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | [2017/06] |
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states Siemens Industry, Inc. 3333 Old Milton Parkway Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGGINS, Robert 1144 Woodcastle St. Henderson NV 89052 / US | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/22] | Capré, Didier Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10802533.9 | 12.05.2010 | [2019/07] | WO2010US01420 | Priority number, date | US20090507806 | 23.07.2009 Original published format: US 507806 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011011033 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2457037 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2457037 | Date: | 13.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F24F5/00, F24F11/30, F24F11/83, F24F110/00 | [2018/41] | CPC: |
F24F5/0003 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/84 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/83 (EP,US);
F24F11/85 (EP,KR,US);
F25B49/02 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2017/50] | G06F17/00, G06F11/00, G06F1/20, G05B15/02, G06Q10/06, G06Q50/06, G06Q50/08, G06Q50/12 | ||
Former IPC [2012/22] | F25B49/02, F25B49/00, F04B49/035 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PUMPEN MIT BEDARFSORIENTIERTEM FLUSS | [2012/22] | English: | DEMAND FLOW PUMPING | [2012/22] | French: | POMPAGE POUR DÉBIT À LA DEMANDE | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 24.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2010 | AL | 13.02.2019 | AT | 13.02.2019 | CY | 13.02.2019 | CZ | 13.02.2019 | EE | 13.02.2019 | FI | 13.02.2019 | HR | 13.02.2019 | LT | 13.02.2019 | LV | 13.02.2019 | MC | 13.02.2019 | MK | 13.02.2019 | MT | 13.02.2019 | NL | 13.02.2019 | PL | 13.02.2019 | RO | 13.02.2019 | SI | 13.02.2019 | SK | 13.02.2019 | SM | 13.02.2019 | TR | 13.02.2019 | IE | 12.05.2019 | LU | 12.05.2019 | BG | 13.05.2019 | NO | 13.05.2019 | GR | 14.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | IS | 13.06.2019 | PT | 13.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 12.05.2010 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
MT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.05.2010 | |
AL | 13.02.2019 | ||
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CY | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
TR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
SI | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
MC | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
AT | 13.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
PL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
SM | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 13.02.2019 | |
CZ | 13.02.2019 | ||
EE | 13.02.2019 | ||
FI | 13.02.2019 | ||
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
RO | 13.02.2019 | ||
SK | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
HR | 13.02.2019 | ||
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
LV | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
IS | 13.06.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
BG | 13.05.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
GR | 14.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NL | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 13.02.2019 | |
LT | 13.02.2019 | ||
NO | 13.05.2019 | ||
PT | 13.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009039500 (STERLING PLANET INC [US], et al) [A] 1,6,11 * paragraph [0008]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] ** paragraph [0089] *; | [XA]US2009171512 (DUNCAN SCOT M [US]) [X] 1,7,13-15 * figures 1-7 * [A] 2-6,8-12 | International search | [A]US5600960 (SCHWEDLER MICHAEL C A [US], et al); | [A]US5963458 (CASCIA MARK A [US]); | [A]JP2006052880 (ONO REINETSU KOGYO KK); | [A]JP2008261536 (TAKASAGO THERMAL ENGINEERING, et al) |