EP2456559 - ROTARY TUMBLER AND METAL RECLAIMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Didion Manufacturing Company 7000 West Geneva Drive Riverside Industrial Centre St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | [2019/47] |
Former [2012/22] | For all designated states Didion Manufacturing Company 7000 West Geneva Drive Riverside Industrial Centre St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Didion, Michael S. 227 Ohmes Road St. Peters, Missouri 63376 / US | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Forrest, Stuart, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [2019/47] |
Former [2012/22] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen W.P. Thompson & Co 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10802538.8 | 15.07.2010 | [2019/47] | WO2010US01995 | Priority number, date | US20090460524 | 21.07.2009 Original published format: US 460524 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011011045 | Date: | 27.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2456559 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2456559 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B02C17/16 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
B22C5/085 (EP,KR,US);
B02C17/002 (EP,KR,US);
B02C17/06 (EP,KR,US);
B02C17/16 (KR);
B02C17/1825 (EP,KR,US);
B02C17/183 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DREHTAUMLER UND RÜCKGEWINNUNGSEINHEIT DAFÜR | [2012/22] | English: | ROTARY TUMBLER AND METAL RECLAIMER | [2012/22] | French: | TUMBLER ROTATIF ET RÉCUPÉRATEUR DE MÉTAUX | [2012/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 01.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2010 | AL | 20.11.2019 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | ES | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | IT | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | NL | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | IE | 15.07.2020 | LU | 15.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.07.2010 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 15.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 15.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 15.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 15.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | ES | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3998262 (DIDION CHARLES J) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0219869 (DIDION MFG CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8904719 (EXTEC SCREENS & CRUSHERS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5267603 (DIDION CHARLES J [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0755735 (DIDION MFG CO [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 47 - column 8, line 35 * * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2005313021 (NETSUKOO KK) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [AP]US2009283237 (MUSSCHOOT THOMAS PAUL [US], et al) [AP] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A] - "AUSLEERTROMMEL MIT ZUSATZLICHER VORPUTZWIRKUNG DURCH PUTZSTERNE", GIESSEREI, GIESSEREI VERLAG, DUSSELDORF, DE, (19891113), vol. 76, no. 23, ISSN 0016-9765, page 817/818, XP000104784 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2751115 (KINDSETH HAROLD V); | [A]US3454230 (ALLEN WALTER R); | [A]US5016827 (DIDION CHARLES J [US]); | [A]US5095968 (DIDION CHARLES J [US]); | [Y]US5108584 (BROSSEUK RAYMOND [CA]); | [A]US5267603 (DIDION CHARLES J [US]); | [Y]US5291714 (WRIGHT BRUCE H [US], et al); | [A]US5628126 (NORTH ROGER D [GB]); | [Y]US5794865 (DIDION CHARLES J [US], et al); | [A]US6000645 (PREISSER MARK A [US]) | by applicant | US3998262 | EP0755735 |