EP2461018 - INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING ELECTRICITY FROM SEA WAVES BY BASIC PULSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De La Cruz Blásquez, Julio Blasco de Garay 59, 1[deg]H 28015 Madrid / ES | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Gonzalez Gomez, Maria Virtudes DK Dissen Mark, SL C/ Pedro Teixeira, 10, 5[deg] oficina 1 28020 Madrid / ES | [2012/23] | Application number, filing date | 10803931.4 | 15.06.2010 | WO2010ES00263 | Priority number, date | ES20090001662 | 28.07.2009 Original published format: ES 200901662 | [2012/23] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011012740 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | ES | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2461018 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/18 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
F03B13/186 (EP);
F03B13/18 (ES);
F03B13/1815 (EP);
F05B2240/95 (EP);
Y02E10/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ELEKTRIZITÄT AUS SEEWELLEN MITHILFE EINES BASISIMPULSVERFAHRENS | [2012/23] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING ELECTRICITY FROM SEA WAVES BY BASIC PULSING METHOD | [2012/23] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR PRODUIRE DE L'ENERGIE ELECTRIQUE A PARTIR DES VAGUES PAR LE PROCEDE D'IMPULSION BASIQUE | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2012 | Translation filed | 03.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 03.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/29] | 12.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2343135 (POUGES RENE [FR]); | [X]GB1515744 (TORNABENE M); | [X]US4392060 (IVY JESSIE T [US]); | [X]ES2148108 (JORGE ALBERTO ANGEL [ES]); | [X]US6208035 (KAO I-NAN [TW]) |