EP2459856 - EXHAUST COMPONENT ASSEMBLIES WITH DIVIDER PLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wescast Industries, Inc. 150 Savannah Oaks Drive Brantford, ON N3T 5L8 / CA | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SLOSS, Clayton, A. 70 Hanlon Place Paris Ontario N3L 4C2 / CA | 02 /
SNOWDON, Richard, T. 37 Bee St. St. Williams Ontario N0E 1P0 / CA | 03 /
PICKARD, Paul, L. 1416 Norfolk County Rd. 19 East Wilsonville Ontario N0E 1Z0 / CA | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2016/52] |
Former [2012/23] | Novagraaf Technologies 122 rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10803968.6 | 27.07.2010 | [2016/52] | WO2010IB01861 | Priority number, date | US20090509999 | 27.07.2009 Original published format: US 509999 | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011012983 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2459856 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2459856 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 03.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/08, F01N13/18, F01N13/10, F02B67/10 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
F01N13/08 (EP,US);
F01N13/10 (EP,US);
F01N13/1811 (EP,US);
F01N2470/10 (EP,US);
F01N2530/00 (EP,US);
F01N2530/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/23] | F01N13/08, F01N13/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGASKOMPONENTENBAUGRUPPEN MIT TEILERPLATTEN | [2012/23] | English: | EXHAUST COMPONENT ASSEMBLIES WITH DIVIDER PLATES | [2012/23] | French: | ENSEMBLES COMPOSANT D'ÉCHAPPEMENT AVEC PLAQUES DE SÉPARATION | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 05.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.07.2010 | AL | 28.12.2016 | AT | 28.12.2016 | BE | 28.12.2016 | CY | 28.12.2016 | CZ | 28.12.2016 | DK | 28.12.2016 | EE | 28.12.2016 | ES | 28.12.2016 | FI | 28.12.2016 | HR | 28.12.2016 | IT | 28.12.2016 | LT | 28.12.2016 | LV | 28.12.2016 | MC | 28.12.2016 | MK | 28.12.2016 | NL | 28.12.2016 | PL | 28.12.2016 | RO | 28.12.2016 | SE | 28.12.2016 | SI | 28.12.2016 | SK | 28.12.2016 | SM | 28.12.2016 | TR | 28.12.2016 | BG | 28.03.2017 | NO | 28.03.2017 | GR | 29.03.2017 | IS | 28.04.2017 | PT | 28.04.2017 | GB | 27.07.2017 | IE | 27.07.2017 | LU | 27.07.2017 | MT | 27.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.07.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
TR | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 27.07.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
MK | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 27.07.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CY | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.07.2010 | |
AT | 28.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
MC | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
MT | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
LU | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
IE | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
GB | 27.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SI | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
DK | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 28.12.2016 | |
BE | 28.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.12.2016 | ||
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
ES | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
IT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
PL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
SK | 28.12.2016 | ||
SM | 28.12.2016 | ||
BG | 28.03.2017 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
IS | 28.04.2017 | ||
PT | 28.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 28.12.2016 | |
EE | 28.12.2016 | ||
FI | 28.12.2016 | ||
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
RO | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
NL | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 28.12.2016 | |
HR | 28.12.2016 | ||
LT | 28.12.2016 | ||
LV | 28.12.2016 | ||
SE | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.03.2017 | ||
GR | 29.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 28.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP1734235 (WESCAST IND INC [CA]) [X] 5,6,8,13 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,9-11 [I] 7,12; | [A]FR2875266 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]EP1734235 (WESCAST IND INC [CA]); | [A]US4790134 (JOHNSON CLEMENS A [US]); | [A]US4084658 (MURPHY MILO E); | [A]US2006053782 (KOBAYASHI NAOYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0686758 (AP PARTS MFG [US]); | [A]US3768260 (GLENN R) | by applicant | EP1734235 |