EP2460835 - ELECTROLYTE MATERIAL, LIQUID COMPOSITION, AND MEMBRANE -ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY FOR POLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOMMURA, Satoru c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Susumu c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
SHIMOHIRA, Tetsuji c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 04 /
WATAKABE, Atsushi c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2014/08] |
Former [2012/23] | 01 /
HOMMURA, Satoru c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Susumu c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIMOHIRA, Tetsuji c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | |||
04 /
WATAKABE, Atsushi c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 5-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/23] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10804324.1 | 22.07.2010 | WO2010JP62381 | Priority number, date | JP20090179066 | 31.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009179066 | [2012/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011013578 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2460835 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2460835 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/18, C25B9/10, H01B1/06, H01M4/86, H01M8/10 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
C08F214/182 (EP,US);
H01B1/122 (EP,US);
H01M8/0289 (EP,US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
H01M8/1081 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROLYTMATERIAL, FLÜSSIGZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND MEMBRAN-ELEKTRODEN-ANORDNUNG FÜR POLYMERELEKTROLYTBRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2012/23] | English: | ELECTROLYTE MATERIAL, LIQUID COMPOSITION, AND MEMBRANE -ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY FOR POLYMER ELECTROLYTE FUEL CELL | [2012/23] | French: | MATÉRIAU ÉLECTROLYTE, COMPOSITION LIQUIDE ET ENSEMBLE MEMBRANE-ÉLECTRODE POUR PILE À COMBUSTIBLE À ÉLECTROLYTE POLYMÈRE | [2014/02] |
Former [2012/23] | MATIÈRE ÉLECTROLYTE, COMPOSITION LIQUIDE ET ENSEMBLE MEMBRANE-ÉLECTRODE POUR PILE À COMBUSTIBLE À ÉLECTROLYTE POLYMÈRE | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2011 | Translation filed | 08.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 20.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 08.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.07.2010 | AL | 25.06.2014 | AT | 25.06.2014 | BE | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | ES | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | HR | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MK | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | SM | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | IE | 22.07.2014 | LU | 22.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | FR | 25.08.2014 | NO | 25.09.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 22.07.2010 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MK | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
LU | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 25.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 22.07.2010 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
TR | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
LU | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 25.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.07.2010 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 25.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 25.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
SM | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 25.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 25.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 22.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 25.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 25.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
FR | 25.08.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
HR | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NO | 25.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP2436705 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-14 * example 15 *; | [A]EP1914824 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * claim - * * paragraphs [0032] - [0033] *; | [A]EP1220344 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * example -; claim - * | International search | [A]WO2007013533 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2008084701 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2008090990 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008243419 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) | by applicant | WO2007013533 | JP2008202039 | JPH0692957 | WO0056694 | JP2006241302 | JPH0435226B | JP2001504872 | JP2005082749 | WO2006038928 | JP2004519296 | JP2009179066 | - MACROMOLECULE, (1993), vol. 26, no. 22, pages 5829 - 5834 | - Seriya Khimicheskaya, IZVESTIYA AKADEMII NAUK SSSR, (1989), vol. 4, pages 938 - 942 | - MACROMOL. SYMP., (1995), vol. 98, pages 753 - 767 |