EP2459946 - REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Hongsik LG Electronics Inc. Ip Group 327-23 Gasandong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 02 /
CHANG, Yonghun LG Electronics Inc. Ip Group 327-23 Gasandong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 03 /
HWANG, Jungyeon LG Electronics Inc. Ip Group 327-23 Gasandong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 04 /
YU, Seonil LG Electronics Inc. Ip Group 327-23 Gasandong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10804613.7 | 04.06.2010 | WO2010KR03616 | Priority number, date | KR20090069025 | 28.07.2009 Original published format: KR 20090069025 | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011013900 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2459946 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/02, F25D23/04 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
F25D23/02 (EP,KR,US);
F25D23/04 (EP,US);
F25D2323/023 (EP,US);
F25D2323/024 (EP,US);
F25D2400/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/23] | F25D23/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | KÜHLSCHRANK | [2012/23] | English: | REFRIGERATOR | [2012/23] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 06.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 12.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2136558 (CHARLES MANSHEL) [X] 1-4,12,13,16,17,20 * page 1, column l, line 19 - line 28 * * page 1, column r, line 16 - page 2, column r, line 61 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 5-11,14,15,18,19; | [Y]JPH109757 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [Y] 5,8-11,14,15,18,19 * abstract * * figures 1-10 *; | [Y]KR200168373Y (JUNG KYU SUNG [KR]) [Y] 6 * figures 2-5 *; | [Y]WO2004029528 (SHIN DONG-JIN [KR]) [Y] 7 * abstract * * figures 1-14 *; | [A]KR100719250B (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]JPS54110859U (ANONYMOUS) [A] 1-20 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]JP2006038437 (WAKABAYASHI HARUO) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * | International search | [X]KR100376167B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.); | [Y]KR20090077564 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]KR970007503B (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [Y]KR900008203Y (SAMSUNG ELECTRONIC [KR]) |