EP2459792 - WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWAK, Dae Wook LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-110 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Jong Min LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-110 / KR | 03 /
HEO, Cheol Kang LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-110 / KR | 04 /
CHO, Han Ki LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-110 / KR | 05 /
NHO, Gyung Hun LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-110 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Soon Jo LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-110 / KR | 07 /
LEE, Kyu Chul LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 391-2 Gaeumjeong-dong Changwon-si Gyeongsangnam-do 641-110 / KR | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10804745.7 | 30.07.2010 | WO2010KR05025 | Priority number, date | KR20090070756 | 31.07.2009 Original published format: KR 20090070756 | KR20090070757 | 31.07.2009 Original published format: KR 20090070757 | [2012/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011014032 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2459792 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2459792 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 21.04.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/26 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
D06F39/00 (EP,US);
D06F37/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHMASCHINE | [2012/23] | English: | WASHING MACHINE | [2012/23] | French: | MACHINE A LAVER | [2014/11] |
Former [2012/23] | MACHINE À LAVER | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 23.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 11.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2010 | AL | 16.07.2014 | AT | 16.07.2014 | BE | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | HR | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | LV | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | MK | 16.07.2014 | MT | 16.07.2014 | NL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | SE | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | SM | 16.07.2014 | IE | 30.07.2014 | LU | 30.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | NO | 16.10.2014 | GR | 17.10.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.07.2010 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MK | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.07.2010 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.07.2010 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
HR | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
MT | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
SM | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
IE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
GR | 17.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
NO | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
SE | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1710339 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0062]; figure 4 *; | [A]EP1666656 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004194514 (NO YANG HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]EP1666656 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |