EP2507276 - COMPOSITION SUITABLE FOR USE AS A CROSS-LINKING MASTERBATCH INCLUDING A FUNCTIONAL POLYOLEFIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2012/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVISME, Samuel 12 Rue du Contrat Social F-76000 Rouen / FR | 02 /
CORFIAS-ZUCCALLI, Catherine Chemin de la Fontaine Malu Hameau des Places F-27500 Pont-audemer / FR | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/08] |
Former [2012/41] | Gavin, Pablo Arkema France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves FR-92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10805263.0 | 24.11.2010 | WO2010FR52499 | Priority number, date | FR20090058622 | 03.12.2009 Original published format: FR 0958622 | [2012/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011067505 | Date: | 09.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2507276 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F255/02, C08J3/22, C09D123/08, H01L31/048 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
C08F255/00 (EP,US);
C08F255/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08J3/22 (KR);
C08J3/226 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C09D123/08 (KR);
C09J151/06 (EP,US);
H01L31/048 (KR);
H01L31/0481 (EP,US);
C08J2423/00 (EP,US);
C08L23/0853 (EP,US);
C08L2312/08 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L51/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/06, C08L2666/04 (EP,US);
C09J151/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C09J151/06, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS VERNETZENDE MUTTERMISCHUNG MIT EINEM FUNKTIONELLEN POLYOLEFIN | [2012/41] | English: | COMPOSITION SUITABLE FOR USE AS A CROSS-LINKING MASTERBATCH INCLUDING A FUNCTIONAL POLYOLEFIN | [2012/41] | French: | COMPOSITION UTILE COMME MELANGE-MAITRE DE RETICULATION COMPRENANT UNE POLYOLEFINE FONCTIONNELLE | [2012/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 31.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0030757 (AKZO NV [NL]) [I] 1-16 * page 1, line 3 - line 6 * * page 4, line 3 - line 14 *; | [A]WO0104200 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [A]US2005051204 (OI KASUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1956661 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR953978 | US3594342 | FR2498609 | FR2569411 | FR2569412 | US5589526 | EP1956661 |