EP2496455 - DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING MOTOR VEHICLE BRAKES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dürr Somac GmbH Zwickauer Strasse 30 09366 Stollberg / DE | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEIER, Uwe An der Morgensonne 20 09387 Jahnsdorf / DE | 02 /
WIELAND, Frank Einsiedler Strasse 22 09235 Burkhardtsdorf / DE | 03 /
WEISSBACH, Kevin Strasse der Einheit 292 09423 Gelenau / DE | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Findeisen Neumann Scheit Partnerschaft mbB Pornitzstraße 1 09112 Chemnitz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Patentanwälte Findeisen & Neumann Pornitzstraße 1 09112 Chemnitz / DE | ||
Former [2012/37] | Findeisen Hübner Neumann Pornitzstraße 1 09112 Chemnitz / DE | Application number, filing date | 10805577.3 | 02.11.2010 | WO2010DE01294 | Priority number, date | DE20091052235 | 04.11.2009 Original published format: DE102009052235 | [2012/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011054346 | Date: | 12.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2496455 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2496455 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16C1/22 | [2013/13] | CPC: |
B60T17/221 (EP);
B60T11/06 (EP);
B60T11/08 (EP);
F16C1/22 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/37] | B60T11/06, B60T11/08, B60T17/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINSTELLUNG VON KRAFTFAHRZEUGBREMSEN | [2012/37] | English: | DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING MOTOR VEHICLE BRAKES | [2012/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGLAGE DE FREINS DE VÉHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2012/37] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 08.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.08.2013 | BG | 28.08.2013 | CY | 28.08.2013 | DK | 28.08.2013 | EE | 28.08.2013 | ES | 28.08.2013 | FI | 28.08.2013 | HR | 28.08.2013 | LT | 28.08.2013 | LV | 28.08.2013 | MC | 28.08.2013 | MK | 28.08.2013 | MT | 28.08.2013 | NL | 28.08.2013 | PL | 28.08.2013 | RO | 28.08.2013 | SE | 28.08.2013 | SI | 28.08.2013 | SM | 28.08.2013 | TR | 28.08.2013 | IE | 02.11.2013 | LU | 02.11.2013 | NO | 28.11.2013 | RS | 28.11.2013 | GR | 29.11.2013 | IS | 28.12.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/32] | BG | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
TR | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
LU | 02.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
RS | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/41] | BG | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
MT | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
LU | 02.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
RS | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | BG | 28.08.2013 | |
CY | 28.08.2013 | ||
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
LU | 02.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
RS | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
MK | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
SM | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
IE | 02.11.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
MC | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
ES | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
EE | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
NL | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
RO | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
DK | 28.08.2013 | ||
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 28.08.2013 | |
FI | 28.08.2013 | ||
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
LV | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
SI | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
GR | 29.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 28.08.2013 | |
HR | 28.08.2013 | ||
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
PL | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 28.08.2013 | |
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
CY | 11.09.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
IS | 28.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 28.08.2013 | |
LT | 28.08.2013 | ||
SE | 28.08.2013 | ||
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 28.08.2013 | |
NO | 28.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 28.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007026208 (VENTRA GROUP INC [CA]; REVELIS PETER [CA]; ZIELINSKI JERRY [CA]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102005031120 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1380487 (INTEGRATED DISPLAY SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19904036723 |