EP2513561 - GUIDING OF A SPARK PLUG INTO A TURBINE ENGINE COMBUSTION CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNECMA 2 Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2016/33] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states SNECMA 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNEL, Jacques, Marcel, Arthur C/o SNECMA PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR | 02 /
DE SOUSA, Mario, César C/o SNECMA PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau F-77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR | 03 /
LEBLOND, Nicolas, Christian, Raymond C/o SNECMA PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR | 04 /
SEVI, Guillaume C/o SNECMA PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR | 05 /
SANDELIS, Denis, Jean, Maurice C/o SNECMA PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau F-77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR | 06 /
PIEUSSERGUES, Christophe C/o SNECMA PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud-Réau 77550 Moissy-Cramayel Cedex / FR | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
BUNEL, Jacques, Marcel, Arthur 12 rue Louis Duperrey F-94320 Thiais / FR | ||
02 /
DE SOUSA, Mario, César 72 rue des Glycines F-77240 Cesson / FR | |||
03 /
LEBLOND, Nicolas, Christian, Raymond 12 boulevard Victor Schöelcher F-77127 Lieusaint / FR | |||
04 /
SEVI, Guillaume 110 B rue Molière F-94200 Ivry Sur Seine / FR | |||
05 /
SANDELIS, Denis, Jean, Maurice 1 allée André Dubois F-77370 Nangis / FR | |||
06 /
PIEUSSERGUES, Christophe 8 rue Gabriel Péri F-77370 Nangis / FR | Representative(s) | Ramey, Daniel, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [2012/43] | Application number, filing date | 10805618.5 | 03.12.2010 | [2016/33] | WO2010FR52606 | Priority number, date | FR20100001260 | 29.03.2010 Original published format: FR 1001260 | FR20090006092 | 16.12.2009 Original published format: FR 0906092 | [2011/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011080433 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2513561 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2513561 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/00, F23R3/50, F23R3/60, F02C7/266, F02C7/20 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
F23R3/50 (EP,US);
F02C7/266 (EP,US);
F23R3/002 (EP,US);
F23R3/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜHRUNG EINER ZÜNDKERZE IN EINE TURBINENMOTOR-BRENNKAMMER | [2016/13] | English: | GUIDING OF A SPARK PLUG INTO A TURBINE ENGINE COMBUSTION CHAMBER | [2012/43] | French: | GUIDAGE D'UNE BOUGIE DANS UNE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION DE TURBOMACHINE | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/43] | FÜHRUNG ENER ZÜNDKERZE IN EINE TURBINENMOTORBRENNKAMMER | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 24.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2010 | AL | 17.08.2016 | AT | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | HR | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | MK | 17.08.2016 | MT | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | RS | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | SM | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | NO | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | IE | 03.12.2016 | LU | 03.12.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 03.12.2010 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
MT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
LU | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 03.12.2010 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
LU | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.12.2010 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
LU | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.12.2010 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
MK | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
LU | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
LU | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
SM | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
HR | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RS | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
NO | 17.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3911672 (IRWIN JOHN A) [A] 1,2,12 * column 1, lines 1-13 * * column 2, lines 5-20 * * column 3, lines 7-29 ** figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5765833 (ABLE EDWARD C [US], et al) [Y] 1,12 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1975512 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [Y] 1,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0013] , [0015] , [0016] , [0018] - [0021] * * figures 1,2; claims 1,3,7-9 *; | [A]EP2088374 (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1,7,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0017] - [0026] * * figures 1-4; claims 1-5,9,10 * |