EP2462502 - SYSTEM FOR INFORMATION COLLATION AND DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Consultancy Services Limited Nirmal Building 9th Floor Nariman Point Mumbai 400 021 Maharashtra / IN | [2012/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARMA, Deepak Tata Consultancy Services Ltd. Quadra 2 Opposite Magarpatta City Hadapsar, Pune 411 028 Maharashtra / IN | 02 /
PUROHIT, Yash Tata Consultancy Services Ltd. Quadra 2 Opposite Magarpatta City Hadapsar, Pune 411 028 Maharashtra / IN | 03 /
NANADIKAR, Anita Tata Consultancy Services Ltd. Banyan Park Suren Road Andheri (East), Mumbai 400 093 Maharashtra / IN | 04 /
SHARMA, Anil, Kumar Tata Consultancy Services Ltd. Banyan Park Suren Road Andheri (East), Mumbai 400 093 Maharashtra / IN | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2012/24] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10806154.0 | 03.08.2010 | WO2010IN00517 | Priority number, date | IN2009MUM1781 | 03.08.2009 Original published format: IN 1781MU2009 | [2017/16] |
Former [2012/24] | IN2009MUM1781 | 03.08.2009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011016056 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2462502 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F17/30 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
G06F3/04815 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04802 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/24] | G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERGLEICHS- UND ANZEIGESYSTEM | [2012/24] | English: | SYSTEM FOR INFORMATION COLLATION AND DISPLAY | [2012/24] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COLLATIONNEMENT ET D'AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS | [2012/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 12.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/37] | 08.08.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.08.2018 | 10.08.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US2006282792 (BERRILL ARTHUR R [CA]); | [X]US2002069415 (HUMBARD CHARLES [US], et al); | [X]US2003011636 (FEROGLIA GENE [US], et al); | [X]US2003142136 (CARTER BRAXTON PAGE [US], et al); | [X]US2006031876 (OK JOON-HO [KR], et al); | [X]CN1259701 (IBM [US]) | Examination | - Psantora ET AL, "iPhone", Wikipedia - the free encyclopedia, (20090801), pages 1 - 25, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=IPhone&oldid=305522076, (20180725), XP055495314 |