EP2462943 - DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE-4 INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states KANEKA CORPORATION 2-3-18, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMINAGA, Yuji c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | 02 /
YOKOTA, Shinichi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Hozumi c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | 04 /
KISHIDA, Hideyuki c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | 05 /
KITAGAWA, Masayasu c/o KANEKA CORPORATION 1-8 Takasagocho Miyamaecho Takasago-shi Hyogo 676-8688 / JP | 06 /
TACHI, Hiroshi c/o Tokyo University of Agriculture 1-1-1 Sakuragaoka Setagaya-ku Tokyo 156-8502 / JP | 07 /
OTA, Toru c/o The University of Morioka 808 Sunagome Takizawaaza Takizawamura Iwate-gun Iwate 020-0183 / JP | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10806220.9 | 03.08.2010 | WO2010JP04872 | Priority number, date | JP20090180829 | 03.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009180829 | [2012/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011016220 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2462943 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/55, A23L1/30, A23L1/305, A61K36/00, A61P3/10, A61P43/00, C12N1/30 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61K38/168 (US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Title | German: | DIPEPTIDYLPEPTIDASE-4-HEMMER | [2012/24] | English: | DIPEPTIDYL PEPTIDASE-4 INHIBITOR | [2012/24] | French: | INHIBITEUR DE DIPEPTIDYLE PEPTIDASE-4 | [2012/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2012 | Translation filed | 21.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 04.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS57186450 (ASANO TSUGUJI) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]WO2004058266 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [IDY]WO2005117933 (CAMPINA NEDERLAND HOLDING BV [NL], et al) [ID] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [XY]JP2008239521 (KANEKA CORP, et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [XY]JP2008239522 (KANEKA CORP, et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [Y] 6; | [A]JP2008280291 (UHA MIKAKUTO CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [AD] - TACHI H ET AL, "An X-prolyl dipeptidyl-aminopeptidase from Aspergillus oryzae", PHYTOCHEMISTRY, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, vol. 31, no. 11, doi:10.1016/S0031-9422(00)97513-7, ISSN 0031-9422, (19920101), pages 3707 - 3709, (19920101), XP026632393 [AD] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(00)97513-7 | International search | [Y]JPH1175765 (AMANO PHARMA CO LTD); | [X]JP2000072687 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND); | [X]JP2001186877 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND); | [X]JP2002027979 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND, et al); | [X]JP2002027978 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND, et al); | [X]JP2004166628 (NIPPON SUPPLEMENT KK, et al); | [X]JP2005325062 (FUJI OIL CO LTD); | [X]JP2006296251 (GUNZE KK) | by applicant | JP2000327689 | JP2004535455 | JP2004536115 | JP2005500321 | JP2007039424 | JP2007277163 | JP2008500304 | WO2008066070 | JP2008280291 | - JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2005), vol. 125, pages 379 - 384 | - EXPERT OPIN. INVESTIG. DRUGS, (2004), pages 1091 - 1102 | - H. TACHI, PHYTOCHEMISTRY, (1992), vol. 31, no. 11, pages 3707 - 3709 |