EP2461374 - SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2012/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJII, Kei c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 02 /
ISHIZUKA, Takashi c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 03 /
AKITA, Katsushi c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 04 /
NAGAI, Youichi c/o Osaka Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-3 Shimaya 1-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 05 /
TANABE, Tatsuya c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries Ltd. 1-1 Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Schuster, Thomas Grünecker Kinkeldey Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10806309.0 | 07.07.2010 | WO2010JP61511 | Priority number, date | JP20090180242 | 01.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009180242 | JP20090206317 | 07.09.2009 Original published format: JP 2009206317 | [2012/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011016309 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2461374 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20, H01L31/105, H01L31/18 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
H01L31/035236 (EP,US);
H01L33/00 (KR);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01L21/02392 (EP,US);
H01L21/02463 (EP,US);
H01L21/02466 (EP,US);
H01L21/02507 (EP,US);
H01L21/02546 (EP,US);
H01L21/02549 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L31/1035 (EP,US);
H01L31/109 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/23] | H01L31/105, H01L31/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/23] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2012/23] | French: | ÉLÉMENT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR SA FABRICATION | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2011 | Translation filed | 02.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2011 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 09.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/26] | 25.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.10.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007264835 (IGUCHI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 14-18,22 * Embodiment 3; figure 7 * [I] 1-13,19-21,23; | [XI] - INADA H ET AL, "Low dark current SWIR photodiode with InGaAs/GaAsSb type II quantum wells grown on InP substrate", CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS - INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDIUM PHOSPHIDE AND RELATED MATERIALS - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INDIUM PHOSPHIDE AND RELATED MATERIALS, IPRM 2009 2009 INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS INC. USA, (20090514), doi:10.1109/ICIPRM.2009.5012464, pages 149 - 152, XP031467199 [X] 14-16 * Sections "I: Introduction"; "II. Experimental procedure"; figure 1 * [I] 1-13,17-23 | [XI] - SIDHU R ET AL, "2.4 [mu]m cutoff wavelength avalanche photodiode on InP substrate", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (20060202), vol. 42, no. 3, doi:10.1049/EL:20063415, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 181 - 182, XP006026029 [X] 14-18,22 * figure 1 * [I] 1-13,19-23 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20063415 | [I] - TAKASAKI H ET AL, "Electroluminescence of In0.53Ga0.47As/GaAs0.5Sb0.5 type II multiple quantum well diodes lattice-matched to InP", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010701), vol. 227-228, doi:10.1016/S0022-0248(01)00708-4, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 294 - 297, XP004250844 [I] 1-23 * Sections "1. Introduction"; "2. MBE growth"; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(01)00708-4 | International search | [Y]JP2004207588 (SONY CORP); | [Y]JP2006190853 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [XP]WO2010073768 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) | [Y] - M.HORITA ET AL., "Metalorganic vapor phase epitaxy growth of InGaAsP multi quantum well laser diodes using entirely organic sources", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, (19941202), vol. 145, no. 1-4, pages 886 - 891, XP024462015 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(94)91158-4 | [X] - R.SIDHU ET AL., "A long-wavelength photodiode on InP using lattice-matched GaInAs-GaAsSb type-II quantum wells", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (200512), vol. 17, no. 12, pages 2715 - 2717, XP008146947 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2005.859163 | [X] - E.PLIS ET AL., "Midwave infrared type-II InAs/GaSb superlattice detectors with mixed interfaces", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (20060701), vol. 100, no. 1, page 014510, XP012088914 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2214222 | [Y] - C.P.SELTZER ET AL., "Reliable 1.5 mu m buried heterostructure, separate confinement, multiple quantum well (BH-SC-MQW) lasers entirely grown by metalorganic vapour-phase epitaxy (MOVPE)", IEEE ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19891012), vol. 25, no. 21, pages 1449 - 1451, XP000080087 | Examination | - KEIPER D ET AL, "Metal organic vapour-phase epitaxy (MOVPE) growth of InP and InGaAs using tertiarybutylarsine (TBA) and tertiarybutylphosphine (TBP) in N"2 ambient", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990701), vol. 204, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0022-0248(99)00210-9, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 256 - 262, XP004179743 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(99)00210-9 | - HORITA M ET AL, "Metalorganic vapor phase epitaxy growth of InGaAsP multi quantum well laser diodes using entirely organic sources", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 145, no. 1-4, doi:10.1016/0022-0248(94)91158-4, ISSN 0022-0248, (19941202), pages 886 - 891, (19941202), XP024462015 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-0248(94)91158-4 | - YUICHI KAWAMURA ET AL, "INGAAS/INAIAS MULTIPLE QUANTUM WELL RESONANT TUNNELING PHOTO TRANSISTOR FOR OPTICAL BISTABILITY", GALLIUM ARSENIDE AND RELATED COMPOUNDS. JERSEY, 24 - 27 SEPT., 1990; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON GALLIUM ARSENIDE AND RELATED COMPOUNDS. (TITLE FROM 1994 ONWARDS: PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON COMPOUND SEMICONDUCTOR, (19900924), vol. SYMP. 17, pages 607 - 612, XP000147007 |