EP2464173 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE STATION DEVICE, CONNECTION DESTINATION EVALUATING METHOD, CONNECTION DESTINATION EVALUATING PROGRAM, AND BASE STATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/24] | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE STATION APPARATUS, CONNECTION DESTINATION EVALUATING METHOD, CONNECTION DESTINATION EVALUATING PROGRAM, AND BASE STATION APPARATUS | ||
[2018/38] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2019/12] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOSHIHARA, Akio c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Hirokazu c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 03 /
SAWADA, Shinichi c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Shigeto c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 05 /
SUZUKI, Kohki c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2012/24] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/12] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/24] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10806396.7 | 30.07.2010 | [2019/12] | WO2010JP62894 | Priority number, date | JP20090184365 | 07.08.2009 Original published format: JP 2009184365 | [2012/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011016397 | Date: | 10.02.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2464173 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2464173 | Date: | 20.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/18, H04W88/10 | [2018/38] | CPC: |
H04W48/18 (EP,US);
H04W88/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/01] | H04W48/18 | ||
Former IPC [2012/24] | H04W48/16, H04W48/18, H04W88/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, MOBILSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON VERBINDUNGSZIELEN, PROGRAMM ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON VERBINDUNGSZIELEN UND BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2012/24] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE STATION DEVICE, CONNECTION DESTINATION EVALUATING METHOD, CONNECTION DESTINATION EVALUATING PROGRAM, AND BASE STATION DEVICE | [2018/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, APPAREIL DE STATION MOBILE, PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION DE DESTINATION DE CONNEXION, PROGRAMME D ÉVALUATION DE DESTINATION DE CONNEXION ET APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE | [2012/24] |
Former [2012/24] | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, MOBILE STATION APPARATUS, CONNECTION DESTINATION EVALUATING METHOD, CONNECTION DESTINATION EVALUATING PROGRAM, AND BASE STATION APPARATUS | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.2012 | Translation filed | 10.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/24] | 29.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2010 | AL | 20.03.2019 | AT | 20.03.2019 | CY | 20.03.2019 | CZ | 20.03.2019 | DK | 20.03.2019 | EE | 20.03.2019 | ES | 20.03.2019 | FI | 20.03.2019 | HR | 20.03.2019 | IT | 20.03.2019 | LT | 20.03.2019 | LV | 20.03.2019 | MC | 20.03.2019 | MK | 20.03.2019 | MT | 20.03.2019 | NL | 20.03.2019 | PL | 20.03.2019 | RO | 20.03.2019 | SE | 20.03.2019 | SI | 20.03.2019 | SK | 20.03.2019 | SM | 20.03.2019 | TR | 20.03.2019 | BG | 20.06.2019 | NO | 20.06.2019 | GR | 21.06.2019 | IS | 20.07.2019 | PT | 20.07.2019 | IE | 30.07.2019 | LU | 30.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | FR | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.07.2010 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
MT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 30.07.2019 | ||
LU | 30.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 30.07.2010 | |
AL | 20.03.2019 | ||
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 30.07.2019 | ||
LU | 30.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CY | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 30.07.2019 | ||
LU | 30.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
IE | 30.07.2019 | ||
LU | 30.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 30.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
LU | 30.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
TR | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
MC | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SI | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
DK | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
IS | 20.07.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
AT | 20.03.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
PL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
SM | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.03.2019 | |
CZ | 20.03.2019 | ||
EE | 20.03.2019 | ||
ES | 20.03.2019 | ||
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
RO | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
SK | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.03.2019 | |
FI | 20.03.2019 | ||
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
IT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
HR | 20.03.2019 | ||
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
LV | 20.03.2019 | ||
NL | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
BG | 20.06.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
GR | 21.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
SE | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.03.2019 | |
LT | 20.03.2019 | ||
NO | 20.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009045968 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0059] , [0076] , [0082] *; | [IY] - HUAWEI, "Proposed CR for hybrid cell (36.304)", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-093755, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090623), no. Los Angeles, USA; 20090623, XP050351987 [I] 13 * paragraphs [5.2.4.1] , [ 5.2.4.2] , [ 5.2.4.8.1] , [ 5.2.4.8.2] * [Y] 1-12 | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); User Equipment (UE) procedures in idle mode (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.304, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090301), no. V8.5.0, pages 1 - 30, XP050377597 [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [5.2.4.8.2] * | [A] - ETSI MCC, "Draft Report of 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 meeting #66bis, Los Angeles, USA, June 29 - July 3, 2009", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-09XXXX_REPORT_RAN2_66BIS_LOS ANGELES_V0.1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090715), no. Shenzhen, China; 20090715, XP050352264 [A] 1-13 * paragraph [4.2.1.2] * | [A] - "Access to Hybrid Cells", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-093247 ACCESS TO HYBRID CELLS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090428), vol. RAN WG2, no. Sanfransisco, USA; 20090504 - 20090508, XP050604532 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X] - "Proposed CR for hybrid cell (36.304)", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 MEETING #66BIS R2-093755, XP050351987 | [Y] - "UE Procedures in Idle Mode", 3GPP TS 36.304 V8.5.0, (20090323), page 23, XP050377597 | [A] - "Open issues for Hybrid/Open cells", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 MEETING #66BIS R2-093950, XP008150799 |