EP2630107 - PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 2-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUROPROPENE BY GAS PHASE FLUORINATION OF PENTACHLOROPROPANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNET, Philippe 12, rue Dr CRESTIN F-69007 Lyon / FR | 02 /
PIGAMO, Anne 9 rue de la Chapelle de Bel Air F-69340 Francheville / FR | 03 /
WENDLINGER, Laurent 18 Hameau des pierres blanches F-69510 Soucieu en Jarrest / FR | 04 /
DOUCET, Nicolas 373 Rue Garibaldi F-69007 Lyon / FR | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/02] | Dang, Doris, et al ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2013/35] | Dang, Doris, et al Arkema France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves F-92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10807352.9 | 22.10.2010 | [2020/02] | WO2010IB03030 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012052798 | Date: | 26.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2630107 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2630107 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/20, C07C17/25, C07C17/42, C07C21/18 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
C07C17/25 (EP,US);
B01J23/866 (US);
C07C17/206 (EP,US);
C07C17/42 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C21/18 (US,EP);
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (EP,US);
C07C17/42, C07C21/18 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 2-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUORPROPEN MITTELS GASPHASENFLUORIERUNG VON PENTACHLOROPROPAN | [2013/35] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF 2-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUROPROPENE BY GAS PHASE FLUORINATION OF PENTACHLOROPROPANE | [2013/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE 2-CHLORO-3,3,3-TRIFLUOROPROPÈNE PAR FLUORATION DE PENTACHLOROPROPANE EN PHASE GAZEUSE | [2013/35] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 10.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 30.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Request for further processing for: | 30.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.05.2014 | Decision despatched | 30.04.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 30.04.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.05.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.10.2010 | AL | 08.01.2020 | AT | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 22.10.2010 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.10.2010 | |
AT | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0328127 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 42 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5900514 (REQUIEME BENOIT [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 5 - line 31 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2007027348 (QUAN HENG-DAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [AD]WO2009015317 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-13 * abstract * * page 4, line 11 - line 24 * * page 9, line 1 - line 10 * | by applicant | GB1091103 | US4902838 | US5714651 | EP0939071 | WO2005108334 | WO2007079431 | WO2008040969 | WO2008054781 | WO2009015317 | US7485598 | US2009240090 | WO2009118628 | WO2009158321 |